EP1847377 - Apparatus for producing an object by sequential deposition of layers of construction material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stratasys Ltd. 2 Holzman Street Rabin Science Park Rehovot 76704 / IL | [2019/09] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Objet Geometries Ltd. 2 Holzman Street, Rabin Science Park Rehovot 76704 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeytoun, Igal 111 Hagilad Street IL-44861, Avnei Hefetz / IL | 02 /
Levi, Moshe 3 Shalag Street IL-63574, Tel-Aviv / IL | 03 /
Kritchman, Eliahu 56 Motta Gur Street IL-69012, Tel-Aviv / IL | 04 /
Eshed, David 48 Antzo Sireni Street IL-44285, Kfar Saba / IL | 05 /
Gothait, Hanan 31 Hashomrim Street IL-76230, Rehovot / IL | 06 /
Danai, Dror 53 Tabenkin Street IL-69353, Tel-Aviv / IL | 07 /
Bar Nathan, Meir 13 Greenspan Street IL-75502, Rishon Lezion / IL | 08 /
Kleinhendler, Chaim 35 Kisos Street IL-71908, Maccabim / IL | 09 /
Menchik, Guy 42 Asher Street IL-43553, Raanana / IL | [2019/13] |
Former [2007/43] | 01 /
Zeytoun, Igal 111 Hagilad Street IL-44861, Avnei Hefetz / IL | ||
02 /
Levi, Moshe 3 Shalag Street IL-63574, Tel-Aviv / IL | |||
03 /
Kritchman, Eliahu 56 Motta Gur Street IL-69012, Tel-Aviv / IL | |||
04 /
Eshed, David 48 Antzo Sireni Street IL-44285, Kfar Saba / IL | |||
05 /
Gothait, Hanan 31 Hashomrim Street IL-76230, Rehovot / IL | |||
06 /
Danai, Dror 53 Tabenkin Street IL-69353, Tel-Aviv / IL | |||
07 /
Bar Nathan, Meir 13 Greenspan Street IL-75502, Rishon Lezion / IL | |||
08 /
Kleinhendler, Chaim 35 Kisos Street IL-71908, Maccabim / IL | |||
09 /
Menchik, Guy 42 Asher Street IL-43553, Raanana / IL | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2019/13] |
Former [2010/47] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Bavariastrasse 7 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2007/43] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07114002.4 | 02.05.2004 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | US20030466731P | 01.05.2003 Original published format: US 466731 P | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1847377 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1847377 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1847377 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/112, B29C64/264, B33Y30/00, B33Y10/00 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
B29C64/112 (EP);
B29C64/264 (EP);
B29C64/277 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B33Y30/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/43] | B29C67/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2007/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Gegenstands durch nacheinander Auftragen von Schichten aus Konstruktionsmaterial | [2007/43] | English: | Apparatus for producing an object by sequential deposition of layers of construction material | [2007/43] | French: | Appareil pour la fabrication d'un objet par dépôt séquentiel d'un matériau de construction | [2018/41] |
Former [2007/43] | Appareil pour la fabrication d'un objet par depôt sequentiel d'un materiau de construction | Examination procedure | 08.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 04.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04730792.1 / EP1631439 | Divisional application(s) | EP19157263.5 / EP3527351 | EP20187574.7 / EP3831575 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040730792) is 29.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2004 | AT | 27.03.2019 | CY | 27.03.2019 | CZ | 27.03.2019 | DK | 27.03.2019 | EE | 27.03.2019 | FI | 27.03.2019 | MC | 27.03.2019 | PL | 27.03.2019 | RO | 27.03.2019 | SE | 27.03.2019 | SI | 27.03.2019 | SK | 27.03.2019 | TR | 27.03.2019 | IE | 02.05.2019 | LU | 02.05.2019 | BG | 27.06.2019 | GR | 28.06.2019 | PT | 27.07.2019 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IE | 02.05.2019 | ||
LU | 02.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IE | 02.05.2019 | ||
LU | 02.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 02.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 02.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | CZ | 27.03.2019 | |
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 27.03.2019 | |
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0052624 (OBJET GEOMETRIES LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-7,32 * figures 2,6; claim - *; | [A]US2002008335 (LEYDEN RICHARD N [US], et al) [A] 1-11,32 * page 8, paragraph 97 ** page 6, paragraph 85 * |