EP1864565 - Variable speed transmission twist control apparatuses and methods for self-propelled mowing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osborne, Christopher M. 1600 Wendy Lane Efland, NC 27243 / US | [2009/23] |
Former [2008/09] | 01 /
Osborne, Christopher M. 1660 Wendy Lane Efland, NC 27243 / US | ||
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
Osborne, Christopher M. 2201 Woodbury Drive Hillsborough, NC 27278 / US | Representative(s) | Charles, Glyndwr Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Charles, Glyndwr Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | Charles, Glyndwr Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Patrner GbR Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07114294.7 | 25.04.2006 | [2007/50] | Priority number, date | US20050125843 | 10.05.2005 Original published format: US 125843 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1864565 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1864565 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/68 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
A01D34/824 (EP,US);
A01D34/6806 (EP,US);
A01D2034/6843 (EP,US);
A01D2101/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Übertragungsdrehung mit variabler Drehzahl für eine selbstangetriebene Mähmaschine | [2007/50] | English: | Variable speed transmission twist control apparatuses and methods for self-propelled mowing machine | [2007/50] | French: | Appareils de contrôle de torsion de transmission à vitesse variable et procédés pour tondeuse à gazon autopropulsée | [2007/50] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 17.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06006418.5 / EP1721504 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.10.2009 | BE | 14.10.2009 | CY | 14.10.2009 | CZ | 14.10.2009 | DK | 14.10.2009 | EE | 14.10.2009 | FI | 14.10.2009 | LT | 14.10.2009 | LV | 14.10.2009 | NL | 14.10.2009 | PL | 14.10.2009 | RO | 14.10.2009 | SI | 14.10.2009 | SK | 14.10.2009 | TR | 14.10.2009 | BG | 14.01.2010 | GR | 15.01.2010 | ES | 25.01.2010 | IS | 14.02.2010 | PT | 15.02.2010 | HU | 15.04.2010 | IE | 25.04.2010 | LU | 25.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
NL | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
IE | 25.04.2010 | ||
LU | 25.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
IE | 25.04.2010 | ||
LU | 25.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
IE | 25.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
IE | 25.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
IE | 25.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 25.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4936160 (BARNARD MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1,14 * abstract *; | [A]US6047614 (BEUGELSDYK ANTHONY F [US], et al) [A] 1,14 * abstract *; | [A]US2002153179 (KOBAYASHI TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1,14 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0087]; figures 1,12-15 *; | [PA]EP1550364 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1,14* paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US2002153179 |