EP1895392 - Device for operating the functions of a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bösnecker, Robert Buchenstr. 16 84030 Ergolding / DE | [2008/10] | Application number, filing date | 07114402.6 | 16.08.2007 | [2008/10] | Priority number, date | DE20061040572 | 30.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006040572 | [2008/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1895392 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/042, H03K17/968 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
H03K17/9631 (EP);
G06F3/0421 (EP);
H03K17/9629 (EP);
H03K2217/96062 (EP);
H03K2217/96066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/46] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Bedienen von Funktionen eines Gerätes | [2008/10] | English: | Device for operating the functions of a device | [2008/10] | French: | Dispositif de commande de fonctions d'un appareil | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3673327 (JOHNSON RALPH G, et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract ** column 3, line 20 - line 62 *; | [YA]DE2517030 (LIEDTKE RAINER DR MED) [Y] 4,5 * page 2 - page 4; figures 1-7 * * claims 1,2 * [A] 1-3,6-13; | [XA]GB1566654 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) [X] 1,6 * page 2, line 12 - line 70 * * figures 4,5 * [A] 2-5,7-13; | [XA]WO8504295 (NP NEW PROD NORDINVENT INVEST [SE]) [X] 1,12 * page 2 - page 6 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2-11,13; | [XAY]US2002103024 (JEFFWAY ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] , [0024] , [0026] , [0027] * [A] 6,11-13 [Y] 4,5 |