EP1900281 - Baked microwavable frozen bread and bakery products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kraft Foods Global Brands LLC Three Lakes Drive Northfield, IL 60093 / US | [2009/44] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS, INC. Three Lakes Drive Northfield Illinois 60093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gan, Renee 2327 N. Halsted Street Chicago, IL 60614 / US | 02 /
Forneck, Keith Daniel 2327 N. Halsted Street Chicago, IL 60614 / US | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07114718.5 | 21.08.2007 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | US20060531601 | 13.09.2006 Original published format: US 531601 | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900281 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A21D2/16, A21D2/18, A21D15/02, A23L1/00, A23L1/025, A21D13/00, A21D17/00 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
A21D13/32 (EP,US);
A21D15/02 (EP,US);
A21D17/006 (EP,US);
A21D2/16 (EP,US);
A21D2/183 (EP,US);
A21D2/188 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/08 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/20, A23V2250/182, A23V2250/192, A23V2250/506, A23V2250/5086, A23V2250/51088, A23V2250/1842 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Title | German: | Mikrowellentaugliches gebackenes und gefrorenes Brot und andere mikrowellentaugliche Backprodukte | [2008/12] | English: | Baked microwavable frozen bread and bakery products | [2008/12] | French: | Pain surgelé à cuire au micro-onde et produits de boulangerie | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4207348 (CROSSEN FRED W JR [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8 * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 15 * * column 7, line 3 - line 6; claims 1,5-13 *; | [XY]US4721622 (KINGHAM CLIVE G [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 42 - line 66 * * column 4, line 32 - line 45 * * column 5, line 33 - line 52 * * column 10, line 30 - line 41; figures 5b,5c; example -; claim - * [Y] 5,8; | [Y]EP0776604 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [Y] 5,8 * page 2, line 44 - line 58; examples 1,2; claim 5 *; | [A]US6210723 (COLEMAN EDWARD C [US], et al) [A] 3,4,6,7,9-11 * example 1 *; | [A]US2002146490 (LAMP MARY A [US], et al) [A] 3,4,6,7,9-11* paragraphs [0038] , [0044]; claims 8,12,13 *; | [X]US2005226962 (HOWARD WALTER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0021] , [0023]; figures 2-4; example - *; | [A] - ORTOLA C ET AL, "ALMACENAMIENTO DEL PAN ENVASADO. I. EFECTOS DE LA REDUCCION DE LA ACTIVIDAD DE AGUA Y CONTROL DE LA CONTAMINACION MICROBIANA SOBRE LAS CARACTERISTICAS DEL PAN STORAGE OF PACKAGED WHITE BREAD. I. EFFECTS OF WATER ACTIVITY REDUCTION AND MICROBIAL CONTAMIN", REVISTA DE AGROQUIMICA Y TECNOLOGIA DE ALIMENTOS, VALENCIA, ES, (1989), vol. 29, no. 3, ISSN 0034-7698, pages 384 - 398, XP009020321 [A] 1,5,9 * figure 3 * |