EP1898226 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SOLAR CELL PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2008/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sonobe, Hiroshi NAGASAKI Research & Development Center c/o MITSUBI NAGASAKI Nagasaki / JP | 02 /
Takano, Akemi NAGASAKI Research & Development Center c/o MITSUBI NAGASAKI Nagasaki / JP | 03 /
Nawata, Yoshikazu NAGASAKI Shipyard & Machinery Works c/o MITSUBISHI NAGASAKI Nagasaki / JP | 04 /
Uchihashi, Kazumasa NAGASAKI Shipyard & Machinery Works c/o MITSUBISHI NAGASAKI Nagasaki / JP | 05 /
Ogawa, Kazuhiko NAGASAKI Shipyard & Machinery Works c/o MITSUBISHI NAGASAKI Nagasaki / JP | 06 /
Yamane, Tsukasa NAGASAKI Shipyard & Machinery Works c/o MITSUBISHI NAGASAKI Nagasaki / JP | 07 /
Yamashita, Nobuki NAGASAKI Research & Development Center c/o MITSUBI NAGASAKI Nagasaki / JP | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Bongiovanni, Simone, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Bongiovanni, Simone, et al Studio Torta S.r.l Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 07115016.3 | 27.08.2007 | [2008/11] | Priority number, date | JP20060241177 | 06.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006241177 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1898226 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1898226 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/26, H01L31/18 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
H01L31/186 (EP,US);
H01L31/046 (EP,US);
H02S50/00 (EP,US);
H02S50/15 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CZ, DE, ES, IT [2011/20] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Solarzellentafeln | [2008/11] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SOLAR CELL PANEL | [2008/11] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un panneau de cellules solaires | [2008/11] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 31.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 11.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6156967 (RALPH EUGENE [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 17, line 12 - line 26 *; | [A]US2005076945 (TACHIBANA SHINSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* paragraph [0023] *; | [Y]JP2005235916 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y] - EL-SHOBOKSHY M S ET AL, "Effect of dust with different physical properties on the performance of photovoltaic cells", SOLAR ENERGY, PERGAMON PRESS. OXFORD, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0038-092X(93)90135-B, vol. 51, no. 6, ISSN 0038-092X, (19931201), pages 505 - 511, (19931201), XP025451996 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0038-092X(93)90135-B |