EP1895343 - Camera module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 2-11-2, Tsurumaki Tama-shi Tokyo / JP | [2009/52] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 2-11-2, Tsurumaki Tama-Shi Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishizawa, Takashi Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd Yamagata Business Division 1-1059-5, Tachiyagawa Yamagata-shi, Yamagata / JP | 02 /
Osaka, Tomohiko Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd Yamagata Business Division 1-1059-5, Tachiyagawa Yamagata-shi, Yamagata / JP | [2009/30] |
Former [2008/10] | 01 /
Ishizawa, Takashi Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd Yamagata Business Division 1-1059-5, Tachiagawa Yamagata-shi, Yamagata / JP | ||
02 /
Osaka, Tomohiko Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd Yamagata Business Division 1-1059-5, Tachiagawa Yamagata-shi, Yamagata / JP | Representative(s) | Solf, Alexander Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Solf, Alexander Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07115201.1 | 29.08.2007 | [2008/10] | Priority number, date | JP20060236884 | 31.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006236884 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1895343 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1895343 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/08, G03B13/34, G02B7/10 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
G02B7/08 (EP,US);
G02B7/102 (EP,US);
G03B13/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/10] | G02B7/09, G03B13/34 | Designated contracting states | DE [2008/46] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kameramodul | [2008/10] | English: | Camera module | [2008/10] | French: | Module d'appareil photographique | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4601539 (WATANABE YOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US4634221 (HOEPFNER CLEMENS [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US5289318 (SEKINE MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 12,16 *; | [DA]JP2004280031 (SHICOH ENG CO LTD) [DA] 1-6* abstract *; | [A]WO2005088153 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US2006028320 (OSAKA TOMOHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |