EP1900519 - Printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gallus Druckmaschinen GmbH Steinbruchstrasse 5 35428 Langgöns-Oberkleen / DE | [2013/17] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Gallus Druckmaschinen GmbH Steinbruchstrasse 5 35428 Langgöns-Oberkleen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bangel, Dieter Gartenstrasse 4 35625 Hüttenberg / DE | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Franzen, Peter, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Intellectual Property Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | Franzen, Peter, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Intellectual Property Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Fey, Hans-Jürgen Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Postfach 10 29 40 69019 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2008/12] | Szymanowski, Carsten Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Intellectual Property Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07115695.4 | 05.09.2007 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | DE20061042884 | 13.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006042884 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1900519 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1900519 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1900519 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/00, B41F5/00 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
B41F13/0024 (EP,US);
B41F13/00 (EP,US);
B41F5/00 (EP,US);
B41P2217/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/12] | B41F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Title | German: | Druckmaschine | [2008/12] | English: | Printing press | [2008/12] | French: | Machine d'impression | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 26.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2007 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | LT | 24.04.2013 | LV | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | MT | 24.04.2013 | PL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | TR | 24.04.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | IS | 24.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | AT | 05.09.2013 | IE | 05.09.2013 | LU | 05.09.2013 | BE | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
MT | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
TR | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
AT | 05.09.2013 | ||
IE | 05.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
AT | 05.09.2013 | ||
IE | 05.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 05.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 05.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
PT | 26.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0020886 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 13* the whole document *; | [I]DE4317684 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH]) [I] 1-6 * column 2, lines 63-68 - column 3, lines 1-9,45-50 *; | [I]DE9420690U (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [I] 1-6 * page 1, paragraph 7 *; | [I]EP0738590 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [I] 1 * column 1, lines 27-29 *; | [Y]US6202316 (SWIFT TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [Y] 7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [XYI]EP1500500 (FISCHER & KRECKE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0013] , [0014] , [0015]; figure 1 * [Y] 7,9,10,13 [I] 2-6; | [T] - Anonyme, "CELITH - Le Granit reconstitué", Microplan Group, (20060506), URL: http://replay.waybackmachine.org/20060506044757/http://www.microplan-group.com/pagine/prodotti_fr/celith_fr.htm, (20110302), XP002641863 [T] 1,7-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] * | by applicant | EP0020886 | DE4317684 | DE9420690U | EP0738590 | EP1500500 | WO2005028202 |