EP1901099 - Module for switching optical wavelengths [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CY, HU, NL, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2015/21] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peloso, Pierre 37 Route d'Orsay 91460, MARCOUSSIS / FR | 02 /
Prunaire, Magali 4 Rue de la Saulaie 91620, NOZAY / FR | 03 /
Faure, Jean-Paul 48 Rue Sarrette 75014, PARIS / FR | [2015/21] |
Former [2008/12] | 01 /
Peloso, Pierre 37 Route d'Orsay 91460, MARCOUSSIS / FR | ||
02 /
Prunaire, Magali 4 Rue de la Saulaie 91620, NOZAY / FR | |||
03 /
Faure, Jean-Paul 48 Rue Sarrette 75014, PARIS / FR | Representative(s) | Sciaux, Edmond Alcatel-Lucent International 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2015/21] |
Former [2014/03] | Loyer & Abello 9, rue Anatole de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/29] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Intellectual Property & Standards 32 Avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2012/10] | Nicolle, Olivier, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2008/12] | Thibaud, Jean-Baptiste Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07115744.0 | 05.09.2007 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | FR20060053675 | 12.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0653675 | [2008/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1901099 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1901099 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1901099 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00, G02B6/293, G02B6/35 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
G02B6/3586 (EP);
G02B6/29395 (EP);
H04Q11/0005 (EP);
G02B6/3512 (EP);
G02B6/3542 (EP);
G02B6/3548 (EP);
G02B6/356 (EP);
G02B6/3562 (EP);
G02B6/357 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/34] | H04Q11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/12] | G02B6/35, H04Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltmodul für optische Wellenlängen | [2008/12] | English: | Module for switching optical wavelengths | [2008/12] | French: | Module de commutation de longueurs d'ondes optiques | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 16.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2007 | AT | 20.05.2015 | CY | 20.05.2015 | CZ | 20.05.2015 | DK | 20.05.2015 | EE | 20.05.2015 | ES | 20.05.2015 | FI | 20.05.2015 | IT | 20.05.2015 | LT | 20.05.2015 | LV | 20.05.2015 | MC | 20.05.2015 | MT | 20.05.2015 | NL | 20.05.2015 | PL | 20.05.2015 | RO | 20.05.2015 | SE | 20.05.2015 | SI | 20.05.2015 | SK | 20.05.2015 | TR | 20.05.2015 | BG | 20.08.2015 | GR | 21.08.2015 | IE | 05.09.2015 | LU | 05.09.2015 | IS | 20.09.2015 | PT | 21.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/22] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IE | 05.09.2015 | ||
LU | 05.09.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IE | 05.09.2015 | ||
LU | 05.09.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
LU | 05.09.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
LU | 05.09.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
LU | 05.09.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5206497 (LEE BYUNG H [US]) [X] 1-3,6-11,15 * abstract * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 26 *; | [X]EP1357408 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-3,6-11,15 * abstract * * column 6, line 36 - column 7, line 20 *; | [A]WO2005047942 (ENGANA PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [X]EP1674906 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-11,15 * abstract * |