EP2033929 - Conveyor with deflector device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matheisl, Michael Wiesengasse 14-16 Top 5 2331 Vösendorf / AT | 02 /
Frim, Norbert Augasse 11/36B 1090 Vienna / AT | 03 /
Streibig, Kurt Forsthausstrasse 25 3031 Rekawinkel / AT | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Gaussmann, Andreas, et al Bogensberger Patent- & Markenbüro Fallsgasse 7 9492 Eschen / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Gaussmann, Andreas, et al Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | ||
Former [2009/11] | Gaussmann, Andreas, et al Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / NW / CH | Application number, filing date | 07115761.4 | 05.09.2007 | [2009/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2033929 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66B23/22, B66B29/04 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
B66B23/22 (EP,US);
B66B29/04 (US);
B66B29/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/47] |
Former [2009/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahreinrichtung mit Abweiservorrichtung | [2009/11] | English: | Conveyor with deflector device | [2009/11] | French: | Dispositif de transport doté d'un dispositif déflecteur | [2009/11] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/13] | 21.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6425472 (DAVIS CHRIS M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10 * the whole document * [A] 3; | [A]US2002179402 (STREIBIG KURT [AT], et al) [A] 1-6,10* paragraphs [0014] - [0016] *; | [XA]JP2003182966 (NISSHIN KK) [X] 1,10 * abstract * [A] 2-6; | [XA]US6595344 (DAVIS CHRIS M [US], et al) [X] 1,10 [A] 2-6 |