EP1898134 - Throttle device for heating and cooling systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helmstädter, Werner Beethovenstrasse 12 74834 Elztal / DE | [2008/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helmstädter, Werner Beethovenstraße 12 74834, Elztal / DE | 02 /
Ebert, Eberhard Stoppelsbergstraße 19 36088, Hünfeld / DE | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al haarpatent Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer Goethestraße 2 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07115762.2 | 05.09.2007 | [2008/11] | Priority number, date | DE20061042166 | 06.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006042166 | [2008/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1898134 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1898134 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/04, F16K5/10 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
F16K5/10 (EP);
F16K47/045 (EP);
G01F1/26 (EP);
G01F15/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/35] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drosseleinrichtung für Heiz- und Kühlanlagen | [2008/11] | English: | Throttle device for heating and cooling systems | [2008/11] | French: | Dispositif de restriction pour installations de chauffage et de refroidissement | [2008/11] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE8033199U (WELLA AG, 6100 DARMSTADT, DE) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XD]DE29806215U (DUMSER METALLBAU GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [XD] 1,3-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5983826 (LOHDE DAN [US]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]DE20117196U (AFRISO EURO INDEX GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03018187 (ASHE MORRIS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,6-8 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 31 *; | [X]WO03044402 (TOUR & ANDERSSON AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * |