EP1868423 - Multilayer build-up wiring board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBIDEN CO., LTD. 1, Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-0917 / JP | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirose, Naohiro c/o Ogaki-kita-kojou Ibiden Kabushiki Kaisha 1, K Ibi-gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP | 02 /
En, Honjin c/o Ogaki-kita-kojou Ibiden Kabushiki Kaisha 1, K Ibi-gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07115803.4 | 08.09.1999 | [2007/51] | Priority number, date | JP19980283437 | 17.09.1998 Original published format: JP 28343798 | JP19980324535 | 28.10.1998 Original published format: JP 32453598 | JP19980362961 | 21.12.1998 Original published format: JP 36296198 | JP19990000315 | 05.01.1999 Original published format: JP 31599 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1868423 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/46, H05K3/38, H05K1/02 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
H05K1/0224 (EP,US);
H05K3/46 (KR);
H01L29/40 (US);
H01L21/4763 (US);
H05K1/03 (US);
H05K3/244 (EP,US);
H05K3/403 (EP,US);
H05K3/4602 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H05K1/0253 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0347 (EP,US);
H05K2201/062 (EP,US);
H05K2201/093 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09509 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09536 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0959 (EP,US);
H05K2201/096 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09645 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09681 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1178 (EP,US);
H05K3/064 (EP,US);
H05K3/382 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, NL [2007/51] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige Leiterplatte | [2007/51] | English: | Multilayer build-up wiring board | [2007/51] | French: | Carte de circuits imprimés multicouches | [2007/51] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 30.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99943231.3 / EP1137333 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990943231) is 19.11.2004 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.11.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 23.11.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3739469 (DOUGHERTY W) [X] 7-10 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 44; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3799777 (O KEEFFE T, et al) [A] 12,13* column 5, line 2 - line 29; figure 5 *; | [X]FR2522459 (SERRAS PAULET EDOUARD [FR]) [X] 7-10 * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4543715 (IADAROLA RALPH E [US], et al) [X] 7-10 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 4; figure 1 *; | [X]JPS60211897 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [X] 3-6 * figure 2 *; | [X]US4754371 (NITTA MITSURU [JP], et al) [X] 3-6 * column 2, line 20 - line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPH0336791 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0464279 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [X]JPH0575258 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 12,13 * abstract *; | [Y]US5479138 (KURODA MASAO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 18; figure 1B *; | [DY]JPH10163634 (KYOCERA CORP) [DY] 1,2 * abstract * |