EP1912191 - Navigation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin AW Co., Ltd. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagase, Kenji c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD. 6-18 Harayama, Oka-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-8564 / JP | 02 /
Ishikawa, Hiroki c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD. 6-18 Harayama, Oka-cho Okazaku-shi Aichi 444-8564 / JP | 03 /
Tomita, Hiroshi c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD. 6-18 Harayama, Oka-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-8564 / JP | 04 /
Nakada, Takayasu c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD. 6-18 Harayama, Oka-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-8564 / JP | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07115934.7 | 07.09.2007 | [2008/16] | Priority number, date | JP20060278710 | 12.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006278710 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1912191 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01, G08G1/123, G08G1/00 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
G08G1/096716 (EP,US);
G01C21/34 (EP,US);
G01C21/3844 (EP,US);
G08G1/096741 (EP,US);
G08G1/096775 (EP,US);
G08G1/096811 (EP,US);
G08G1/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Title | German: | Navigationssystem | [2008/16] | English: | Navigation system | [2008/16] | French: | Système de navigation | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 25.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19638069 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM MOBIL [DE]) [A] 1-5* page 3, line 65 - page 4, line 25 *; | [Y]US6061625 (FASTENRATH ULRICH [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * column 4, lines 1-13 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 38 * * column 6, lines 1-5 * * column 6, lines 7-14 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1146495 (DDG GES FUER VERKEHRSDATEN MBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0006] , [0013] * * claims 19,22 *; | [A]GB2361794 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * page 5, lines 13-16 * * claims 8-10 *; | [Y]US6704564 (LANGE RAINER M [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 8, lines 32-39 * * figure 1 * |