EP2037418 - Method and system for electronic ticketing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast-natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Waaij, Bram Dirk L.B. Pearsonstraat 7 9728 WR Groningen / NL | 02 /
Langius, Erik Alle Fokko Oosterhamrikkade 2x 9714 BA Groningen / NL | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07116598.9 | 17.09.2007 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2037418 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G07B15/00 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
G07B15/00 (EP);
G07C9/27 (EP,US);
G06Q20/045 (EP);
G06Q20/12 (EP);
G06Q20/322 (EP);
G06Q20/325 (EP);
G06Q20/425 (EP);
G07F17/42 (EP);
H04M2203/1008 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/48] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur elektronischen Ticketausgabe | [2009/12] | English: | Method and system for electronic ticketing | [2009/12] | French: | Procédé et système de billetterie automatique | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/11] | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1028578 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0103090 (JPM INTERNAT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2361570 (BRITISH AIRWAYS PLC [GB]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 14, line 16 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]KR20020041867 (KIM SUNG NYUN [KR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]FR2823944 (HAON LIONEL [FR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * pages 1-3 * * figure 1 *; | [X]GB2390211 (PREPAYMENT CARDS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - page 22 * * figures 1-5 * * claims 1-48 *; | [A]US2006009203 (KIM SUN KYUNG [KR]) [A] 1-9* abstract * |