EP1903016 - Impregnation of stabilized pitch fiber performs with pitch during the preforming process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. Law Dept. AB/2B, 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fryska, Slawomir T. 15121 Clifden Drive Granger, IN 46530 / US | 02 /
LaForest, Mark L. 14620 Horseshoe Bend Court Granger, IN 46530 / US | 03 /
Simpson, Allen H. 4523 Chamberlain Road Buchanan, MI 49107 / US | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07116700.1 | 18.09.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | US20060523026 | 19.09.2006 Original published format: US 523026 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1903016 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/83 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
C04B35/83 (EP);
B32B18/00 (EP);
C04B35/63 (EP);
C04B35/63444 (EP);
C04B35/63496 (EP);
C04B35/653 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/49] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Imprägnierung stabilisierter Pechfaservorformen mit Pech während des Vorformungsprozesses | [2008/13] | English: | Impregnation of stabilized pitch fiber performs with pitch during the preforming process | [2008/13] | French: | Imprégnation de préforme fibreuse avec du brai pendant le procédé de préformage | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 10.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0307968 (PETOCA LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10 * claim 1 *; | [X]US4986943 (SHEAFFER PATRICK M [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO0028150 (WAP REINIGUNGSSYSTEME [DE], et al) [X] 1,10 * page 3, lines 12-27 ** page 10, line 3 - page 11, line 25 *; | [X]US2005266220 (LA FOREST MARK L [US], et al) [X] 1,4,9,10 * paragraphs [0029] - [0032] *; | [X]US2006177663 (SIMPSON ALLEN H [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9-11,14 * paragraphs [0014] - [0019] *; | [XP]EP1731292 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [XP] 1,2,4,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] - [0010] - [0018]; claim 1 * |