EP2042560 - Lightweight wooden materials with good mechanical properties and low formaldehyde emission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weinkötz, Dr. Stephan Hermann-Ehlers-Strasse 6 67434 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
Finkenauer, Michael An der Brennerei 11 67593 Westhofen / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Michael Rheinhäuser Strasse 86c 67346 Speyer / DE | 04 /
Peretolchin, Dr. Maxim Friedrichsring 14 68161 Mannheim / DE | [2009/14] | Application number, filing date | 07116701.9 | 19.09.2007 | [2009/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2042560 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08L97/02, B27N3/00 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
B27N3/005 (EP,US);
C08L97/02 (EP,US);
C08L61/20 (EP,US);
C08L75/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249972 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/253 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31989 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L97/02, C08L2666/16 (US,EP);
C08L97/02, C08L2666/20 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/50] |
Former [2009/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Leichte Holzwerkstoffe mit guten mechanischen Eigenschaften und geringer Formaldehyd-Emission | [2009/14] | English: | Lightweight wooden materials with good mechanical properties and low formaldehyde emission | [2009/14] | French: | Matériaux légers dérivés du bois dotés de bonnes propriétés mécaniques et d'émissions réduites de formaldéhyde | [2009/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/14] | 09.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2072686 (UPJOHN CO) [X] 1-16 * page 1, lines 5-7 * * page 5, line 24 - page 7, line 13 * * page 7, lines 52-59; claim - *; | [X]DE10028607 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-16 * page 2, line 30 - page 5, line 5; claim - *; | [X]WO0226851 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-16* page 2, line 28 - page 8, line 3; claim - *; | [X]WO2004113428 (AGRO BIOMASS CONSULT APS [DK], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 1, line 7 - page 3, line 7; example 2 * * page 5, lines 13-21; claim - *; | [X]WO2007081645 (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0020] - [0035] - [0038] - [0042] - [0046]; claim - * |