EP2039557 - Electrical energy recharging device for industrial or transport vehicle, assembly comprising said device and said vehicle, and recharging assembly comprising several of said devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iveco France S.A. 1 Rue des Combats du 24 Août 1944 Porte E 69200 Vénissieux / FR | [2009/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steffen, Bernard 73 B rue Coste 69300 Caluire et Cuire / FR | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2009/13] | Borsano, Corrado, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07116941.1 | 21.09.2007 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2039557 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2039557 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18, B60M7/00, B60L1/00, B60L1/02, B60L11/00, B60L11/16 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
B60M7/003 (EP,US);
B60L1/003 (EP);
B60L1/02 (EP);
B60L50/30 (EP);
B60L50/40 (EP);
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
B60L53/30 (EP,US);
B60L53/36 (EP);
B60L53/65 (EP);
B60L2200/18 (EP);
B60L2240/12 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/13] | B60L11/18, B60M7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/21] |
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Wiederaufladung der elektrischen Energie in einem Nutz- oder Transportfahrzeug, Baugruppe mit besagter Vorrichtung sowie besagtem Fahrzeug sowie Wiederaufladungsanordnung mit mehreren Exemplaren der besagten Vorrichtung | [2009/13] | English: | Electrical energy recharging device for industrial or transport vehicle, assembly comprising said device and said vehicle, and recharging assembly comprising several of said devices | [2009/13] | French: | Dispositif de recharge d'énergie électrique pour véhicule industriel ou transport, ensemble comportant un tel dispositif et ledit véhicule, et ensemble de recharge comportant plusieurs de ces dispositifs | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.04.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2007 | AT | 24.05.2017 | CY | 24.05.2017 | CZ | 24.05.2017 | DK | 24.05.2017 | EE | 24.05.2017 | FI | 24.05.2017 | LT | 24.05.2017 | LV | 24.05.2017 | MC | 24.05.2017 | PL | 24.05.2017 | PT | 24.05.2017 | RO | 24.05.2017 | SI | 24.05.2017 | SK | 24.05.2017 | TR | 24.05.2017 | BG | 24.08.2017 | GR | 25.08.2017 | IE | 21.09.2017 | LU | 21.09.2017 | MT | 21.09.2017 | IS | 24.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.09.2007 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
MT | 21.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.09.2007 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
MT | 21.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.09.2007 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
MT | 21.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
MT | 21.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2185866 (CITY WHEELS LTD) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [X]EP0788212 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [X] 1-16 * column 10, line 9 - column 13, line 52; figures 1-14 *; | [X]EP1205340 (MOULD ADRIAN ROBERT [GB]) [X] 1-4,12 * the whole document * | Examination | CH688599 | CH688598 | by applicant | EP1205340 |