EP1903661 - Cableless switching and input device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bösnecker, Robert Buchenstr. 16 84030, Ergolding / DE | [2008/13] | Application number, filing date | 07117051.8 | 24.09.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | DE20061045181 | 25.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006045181 | [2008/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1903661 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1903661 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
H02J13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2017/22] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kabellose Schalt- und Eingabevorrichtung | [2008/13] | English: | Cableless switching and input device | [2008/13] | French: | Dispositif de saisie et de commutation sans fil | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3866177 (KAWAMATA YUKIO, et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 7; | [A]CN2140583Y (MA XINGCAN [CN]) [A] 5* the whole document *; | [XI]DE19701945 (D & S DITTMAR & SCHULZE AUTOMA [DE]) [X] 1-4,14-17,26 * the whole document * [I] 18-21; | [XYI]DE19711788 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,12,21-24 * the whole document * [Y] 7 [I] 5,8-11,13,19,20,25; | [A]CN2426659Y (CHEN CAIFU [CN]) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2006097890 (ATKINS BARRY L [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0014] - [0022]; figures 2C,3 * [A] 8 |