EP2040030 - Positioning method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Geosystems AG Heinrich-Wild-Strasse 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [2009/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bühlmann, Andreas Seestrasse 250 3658 Merlingen am Thunersee / CH | 02 /
Stempfhuber, Werner Allmendstrasse 2 8102 Oberengstringen / CH | 03 /
Steger, Urs Bomertstrasse 9 9423 Altenrhein / CH | 04 /
Desmond, Matthew Grundstrasse 24 9445 Rebstein / CH | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Büchel, Kaminski & Partner Patentanwälte Est. Austrasse 79 9490 Vaduz / LI | Application number, filing date | 07117079.9 | 24.09.2007 | [2009/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2040030 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
G01C15/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/49] |
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Positionsbestimmungsverfahren | [2009/13] | English: | Positioning method | [2009/13] | French: | Procédé de détermination de la position | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1079029 (MOBA MOBILE AUTOMATION GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0026]; figure 1 ** paragraphs [0032] - [0035]; figure 3 *; | [A]EP1464981 (TELECOM ITALIA MOBILE SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0150] - [0155]; figure 9 * |