EP1930824 - CAD apparatus, method and computer product for designing printed circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumagai, Yoshitomo c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-Chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/24] | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07117419.7 | 27.09.2007 | [2008/24] | Priority number, date | JP20060330501 | 07.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006330501 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1930824 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50, G06T11/20 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
G06F30/18 (EP,US);
G06F30/12 (US);
G06F30/39 (EP,US);
G06F2115/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/08] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CAD-Vorrichtung und -Verfahren sowie Computerprogramm zum Entwerfen einer bestückten Leiterplatte | [2008/24] | English: | CAD apparatus, method and computer product for designing printed circuit board | [2008/24] | French: | Appareil de CAO et produit informatique pour la création d'une carte de circuit imprimé | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 12.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 16.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/20] | 02.01.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5164908 (IGARASHI SHINICHI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3 *; | [X]US5568397 (YAMASHITA KEIICHIROU [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 4, line 9 - column 6, line 24 *; | [X]US5987458 (ANDERSON KENNETH GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 6, line 26 - column 9, line 34 *; | [X]US2002018583 (GONT VAL [CA], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0082] *; | [A]US2005080502 (CHERNYAK ALEX H [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] ** paragraph [0122] *; | [X] - HERNITER M E, "PC board design and fabrication using Schematics, PADS-PERFORM, and a laser printer", FRONTIERS IN EDUCATION CONFERENCE, 1994. TWENTY-FOURTH ANNUAL CONFERENCE. PROCEEDINGS SAN JOSE, CA, USA 2-6 NOV. 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19941102), ISBN 0-7803-2413-7, pages 111 - 115, XP010218070 [X] 1-9 * page 111 - page 112 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FIE.1994.580481 | Examination | US2004034842 |