EP1915041 - Printed wiring board and printed wiring board manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBIDEN CO., LTD. 1, Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-0917 / JP | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakai, Toru c/o Ogaki-kita-kojou, IBIDEN CO., Ltd. 1, Kitakata 1-chome, Ibigawacho, Ibi-gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07117553.3 | 30.09.2002 | [2008/17] | Priority number, date | JP20010299668 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001299668 | JP20010299669 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001299669 | JP20010299670 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001299670 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915041 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/34, H05K3/24, H05K3/46, H01L23/12, C23C18/31, C23C18/44 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
C23C18/54 (EP,US);
H05K1/115 (US);
H01L21/486 (EP,US);
H01L23/498 (EP,US);
H01L23/49816 (EP,US);
H01L23/49822 (EP,US);
H01L23/538 (EP,US);
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
H05K3/244 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05568 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05573 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13111 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16237 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81026 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81192 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81801 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01012 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01019 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0102 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01023 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01025 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0103 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01046 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01051 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01058 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01061 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01067 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15312 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19041 (EP,US);
H05K1/112 (EP,US);
H05K3/28 (EP,US);
H05K3/3463 (EP,US);
H05K3/383 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, NL [2008/17] | Title | German: | Gedruckte Leiterplatte und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer gedruckten Leiterplatte | [2008/17] | English: | Printed wiring board and printed wiring board manufacturing method | [2008/17] | French: | Carte de circuit imprimé et procédé de fabrication de carte de circuit imprimé | [2008/17] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.11.2012 | 29.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/19] | 29.12.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02800278.0 / EP1432293 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020800278) is 17.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5221038 (MELTON CYNTHIA M [US], et al) [Y] 1,6 * column 1, line 59 - column 4, line 38; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0697805 (LEARONAL INC [US]) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 24; example 3 *; | [Y]WO9617974 (ALPHA FRY LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-3,5,7 * page 1, line 4 - page 21, line 18 *; | [A]JPH08172273 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH1117321 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0131984 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * figures 1-22 *; | [PY]EP1162867 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [PY] 1-7* the whole document *; | [Y] - "Properties of Platinum Group Metals", (20001210), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20001210051 900/http://www.platinum.matthey.com/applications/properties.html, XP002471550 [Y] 2 * the whole document * |