EP2045360 - Method for manufacturing a steel part by hot forming and steel part manufactured by hot forming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [2009/47] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Steel AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasenfuss, Sabine Sigmaringer Strasse 35 70567 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Lupp, Barbara Morgenstrasse 31 44319 Dortmund / DE | 03 /
Albers, Ansgar Nordseestrasse 23 45665 Recklinghausen / DE | 04 /
Meurer, Manfred Johannes-Laers-Strasse 57a 47495 Rheinberg / DE | 05 /
Warnecke, Wilhelm Buschfeld 21 46499 Hammwinkeln / DE | [2009/24] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
Hasenfuss, Sabine Dipl.-Ing. Sigmaringer Strasse 35 70567 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
Lupp, Barbara Dipl.-Ing Morgenstrasse 31 44319 Dortmund / DE | |||
03 /
Albers, Ansgar Dipl.-Ing. Nordseestrasse 23 45665 Recklinghausen / DE | |||
04 /
Meurer, manfred Johannes-laers-Strasse 57a 47495 Rheinberg / DE | |||
05 /
Warnecke, Wilhelm Buschfeld 21 46499 Hammwinkeln / DE | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/15] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 07117719.0 | 02.10.2007 | [2009/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2045360 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2045360 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/02, C21D7/13 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
C23C2/02 (EP,US);
C21D7/02 (EP,US);
C21D8/0205 (EP,US);
C21D8/0278 (EP,US);
C21D9/48 (EP,US);
C23C2/0224 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Stahlbauteils durch Warmformen und durch Warmformen hergestelltes Stahlbauteil | [2009/15] | English: | Method for manufacturing a steel part by hot forming and steel part manufactured by hot forming | [2009/15] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un composant en acier par façonnage à chaud et composant en acier fabriqué par façonnage à chaud | [2009/15] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 06.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.08.2012
06.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE ARCELORMITTAL FRANCE 5, rue Luigi Cherubini F-93212 LA PLAINE ST DENIS / FR Opponent's representative Plaisant, Sophie Marie ArcelorMittal R&D - Intellectual Property 1-5 Rue Luigi Cherubini 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.08.2012
06.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE ARCELORMITTAL FRANCE 5, rue Luigi Cherubini F-93212 LA PLAINE ST DENIS / FR Opponent's representative Plaisant, Sophie Marie ArcelorMittal R&D - Intellectual Property 1-5 Rue Luigi Cherubini 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | 09.10.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.02.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 04.03.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 03.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 30.11.2011 | CY | 30.11.2011 | CZ | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | EE | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | IE | 30.11.2011 | IT | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | LT | 30.11.2011 | LV | 30.11.2011 | MT | 30.11.2011 | NL | 30.11.2011 | PL | 30.11.2011 | RO | 30.11.2011 | SE | 30.11.2011 | SI | 30.11.2011 | SK | 30.11.2011 | BG | 29.02.2012 | GR | 01.03.2012 | ES | 11.03.2012 | IS | 30.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | GB | 02.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2018/43] |
Former [2013/34] | CH | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 02.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CH | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 30.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57200548 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-30* abstract *; | [A]EP1143029 (USINOR [FR]) [A] 1-30 * figures 1-4; claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE10246614 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-30 * figure 1; claims 1-5 *; | [XA]WO2005009642 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 27-30 * figures 1-3; claims 1-9 * [A] 1-26; | [A]WO2006045570 (THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-30 * figure 1; claims 1-22 *; | [A]EP1767670 (THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG [DE]) [A] 1-30 * claims 1-8 *; | [A] - LENZE F-J ET AL, "Herstellung von Karosseriebauteilen aus warmumgeformten h chfesten Stahlwerkstoffe", EFB TAGUNGSBAND, EUROPAEISCHE FORSCHUNGSGESELLSCHAFT FUER BLECHVERARBEITUNG, DE, (20050101), vol. 25, pages 53 - 61, XP009098694 [A] 1-30 * abstract * | [A] - BABBIT M, "SOME HIGHLIGHTS ON NEW STEEL PRODUCTS FOR AUTOMOTIVE USE", STEEL RESEARCH INTERNATIONAL, VERLAG STAHLEISEN GMBH., DUSSELDORF, DE, (20060101), vol. 77, no. 9/10, ISSN 1611-3683, pages 620 - 626, XP001503675 [A] 1-30 * abstract * |