EP2052727 - Hoodia extract oil compositions comprising unsaturated monoacylglycerides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duchateau, Gustaaf Servaas Marie Joseph Emile c/o Unilever R&D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
Melnikov, Sergey Michailovich c/o Unilever R&D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 03 /
Velikov, Krassimir Petkov c/o Unilever R&D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 04 /
Abrahamse, Salomon Leendert c/o Unilever R&D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Wurfbain, Gilles L. Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Wurfbain, Gilles L. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 07117735.6 | 02.10.2007 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2052727 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2052727 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/27, A61P3/04 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
A61K36/27 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/06] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hoodiaextrakt-Öl-Zusammensetzungen mit ungesättigten Monoacylglyceriden | [2009/18] | English: | Hoodia extract oil compositions comprising unsaturated monoacylglycerides | [2009/18] | French: | Compositions d'huile à l'extrait de Hoodia comprenant des monoacylglycérides insaturés | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/29] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor | 18.05.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 18.05.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.06.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9846243 (CSIR [ZA], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6426078 (BAUER KURT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2006069619 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-21 * page 20; example 8; claim 7 *; | [Y]WO2007096239 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-21 * pages 15,19,21 *; | [Y]WO2007096217 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-21* the whole document *; | [Y] - BRUYNS P, "A REVISION OF HOODIA AND LAVRANIA (ASCLEPIADACEAE - STAPELIEAE)", BOTANISCHE JAHRBUECHER FUER SYSTEMATIK, PFLANZENGESCHICHTE UNDPFLANZENGEOGRAPHIE, STUTTGART, DE, (19931015), vol. 115, no. 2, ISSN 0006-8152, pages 145 - 270, XP002072474 [Y] 1-21 * page 175 - page 176 * | [Y] - WHITE & SLOANE ED - ABBEY SAN ENCINO PRESS, Trichocaulon piliferum, THE STAPELIAE, US, PAGE(S) 1000 - 1002, (19370101), XP002525572 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * | [Y] - J.-C. KIM ET AL., "Subchronic toxicity of plant sterol esters administered by gavage to Sprague-Dawley rats", FOOD AND CHEMICAL TOXICOLOGY, (20020422), vol. 40, no. 11, page 1569, XP009131809 [Y] 1-21 * page 1569, column r, paragraph l - page 1570, column l, paragraph 1 * |