EP1909354 - Reflection-type bandpass filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. No. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guan, Ning c/o Fujikura Ltd., Sakura Works, 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba / JP | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07117809.9 | 03.10.2007 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | JP20060274322 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006274322 | JP20060321596 | 29.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006321596 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1909354 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/203 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
H01P1/203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/51] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reflektionsbandpassfilter | [2008/15] | English: | Reflection-type bandpass filter | [2008/15] | French: | Filtre passe-bande de type réfléchissant | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 10.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 26.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/16] | 26.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1728904 (SOSHNIKOV VIKTOR [SU], et al) [A] 1-9,13-18 * figure . * * abstract *; | [X] - GAOBIAO XIAO ET AL, "A New Numerical Method for Synthesis of Arbitrarily Terminated Lossless NonuniformTransmission Lines", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200102), vol. 49, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9480, XP011038268 [X] 1-9,13-18 * page 374, paragraph IV.C - page 375, paragraph V * * page 373; table 1 * * figures 1,3,4 * * abstract * | [X] - GAOBIAO XIAO ET AL, "Impedance Matching for Complex Loads Through Nonuniform Transmission Lines", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200206), vol. 50, no. 6, ISSN 0018-9480, XP011076613 [X] 1-9,13-18 * page 1522, paragraph III - page 1524, paragraph IV * * figures 1-4 * * abstract * | [X] - DA-CHIANG CHANG ET AL, "Wide-Band Equal-Ripple Filters inNonuniform Transmission Lines", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200204), vol. 50, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9480, XP011076539 [X] 1-9,13-18 * page 1116, paragraph III - page 1119, paragraph IV * * figures 9-12 * * abstract * | [A] - RENATO DE PÁDUA MOREIRA ET AL, "Direct Synthesis of Microwave Filters Using Inverse Scattering Transmission-Line Matrix Method", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200012), vol. 48, no. 12, ISSN 0018-9480, XP011038181 [A] 1-9,13-18 * the whole document * |