EP2045915 - Low noise amplifier and mixer front-end circuit and method for gain control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONZALEZ, Jose Luis c/o Dep. d'Enginyeria Electr. Universitat de Catalunya, Jordi Girona,1-3 08034, Barcelona / ES | 02 /
MATEO, Diego c/o Universitat de Catalunya Modul C-4,Campus Nord UPC Jordi Girona, 1-3 08034, Barcelona / ES | 03 /
ARAGONES, Xavier/2c/o Universitat de Catalunya Modul C-4,Campus Nord UPC Jordi Girona 1-3 08034, Barcelona / ES | 04 /
CAIRO MOLINS, Josep Ignasi Epson Europe Edificio Test-c/Alcalde Barnils,64-68 Modul 2° 08190, Sant Cugat del Vallés (Barcelona) / ES | 05 /
GIL GALI, Ignacio c/o Epson Europe Electronics Edificio Test-c/Alcalde Barnils,64-68 Modul C 2° 08190, Sant Cugat del Valles (Barcelona) / ES | 06 /
TANAKA, Kazuaki c/0 Epson Europe Electr. Edificio Test-c/Alcalde Barnils,64-68 Modul c 2° 08190, Sant Cugat del Vallés (Barcelona) / ES | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 07117818.0 | 03.10.2007 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2045915 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45, H03F3/189, H03G1/00 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
H03F3/19 (EP);
H03F3/45475 (EP);
H03G1/0088 (EP);
H03F2200/18 (EP);
H03F2200/27 (EP);
H03F2200/294 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | [2009/51] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Geräuschverstärker und Mischer-Front-End-Schaltung sowie Verfahren zur Verstärkungskontrolle | [2009/15] | English: | Low noise amplifier and mixer front-end circuit and method for gain control | [2009/15] | French: | Amplificateur à faible bruit et circuit frontal mélangeur et procédé de commande de gain | [2009/15] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/14] | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5675290 (TSUKAHARA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 2, lines 10-23,33-43; figures 4,5 * * column 5, line 54 - column 7, line 6 *; | [A]EP0818879 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* column 18, line 57 - column 20, line 33; figure 12 *; | [X]US2006281430 (YAMAMOTO MASAKI [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] - [0027] - [0036] , [0042] - [0046] - [0049] - [0051] - [0055] - [0057] - [0059] - [0062]; figures 1,2,4-6 * |