EP1911929 - Method for determining changes in the position of tubbing rings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grafinger, Helge Teisenberggasse 25 5020 Salzburg / AT | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Mag. Michael Babeluk Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 A-1150 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 07117857.8 | 04.10.2007 | [2008/16] | Priority number, date | AT20060001695 | 11.10.2006 Original published format: AT 16952006 | [2008/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1911929 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E21D9/00, E21D11/08 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
E21D11/08 (EP);
E21D9/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] |
Former [2008/52] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Veränderung der Lage von Tübbingringen | [2008/16] | English: | Method for determining changes in the position of tubbing rings | [2008/16] | French: | Procédé destiné à la détermination de la modification de la position d'anneaux de cuvelage | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 13.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 09.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 09.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 09.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 09.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4237689 (DYCKERHOFF & WIDMANN AG [DE]) [DA] 1-12 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0791725 (NEYRPIC FRAMATOME MECANIQUE [FR]) [DA] 1-12* abstract *; | [X]DE19918215 (HOCHTIEF AG HOCH TIEFBAUTEN [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-12 * column 7, lines 33-48 * * column 8, lines 7-20 *; | [PA]JP2007147498 (KAJIMA CORP) [PA] 1-12 * abstract * |