EP1884855 - Voltage generator circuit and method for controlling thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited 2-10-23 Shin-Yokohama Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | [2010/25] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Fujitsu Microelectronics Limited 7-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0722 / JP | ||
Former [2008/06] | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Hajime c/o FUJITSU VLSI LIMITED 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi Aichi 487-0013 / JP | 02 /
Saito, Syuichi c/o FUJITSU VLSI LIMITED 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi Aichi 487-0013 / JP | 03 /
Iwase, Akihiro c/o FUJITSU VLSI LIMITED 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi Aichi 487-0013 / JP | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2008/06] | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07118061.6 | 25.02.2002 | [2008/06] | Priority number, date | JP20010107131 | 05.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001107131 | JP20010182982 | 18.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001182982 | [2008/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1884855 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1884855 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1884855 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/46 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
G05F1/46 (EP,US);
G11C5/14 (KR);
G05F1/465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/06] | Title | German: | Spannungsgeneratorschaltung und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2008/06] | English: | Voltage generator circuit and method for controlling thereof | [2008/06] | French: | Circuit générateur de tension et son procédé de contrôle | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.07.2010 | 07.07.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02251264.4 / EP1248174 | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0454170 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [X]EP0613071 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,15-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5408172 (TANIMOTO JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-32* column A *; | [A]US5506495 (UCHIDA TOSHIYA [JP]) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [A]US5675280 (NOMURA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [X]US5696465 (ISHIZUKA NOBUHIKO [JP]) [X] 1,15-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5757226 (YAMADA TOYONOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [X]US5811861 (NUNOKAWA HIDEO [JP]) [X] 1-8,11,14-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5903513 (ITOU TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [A]US5986293 (SUZUKI TAKAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [A]US5990671 (NAGATA KYOICHI [JP]) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [A]US5994886 (SHINOZAKI NAOHARU [JP]) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [A]US6064188 (TAKASHIMA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * column A *; | [A]US6111395 (HIRADE TAKUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * column A * | by applicant | US5811861 |