EP1911363 - Footwear and sole for footwear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scherf, Rudolf Löwenburgstr. 25 50939 Köln / DE | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Bals, Rüdiger, et al Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/51] | Bals, Rüdiger, et al Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Bals, Rüdiger, et al Bals & Vogel Universitätsstraße 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 07118251.3 | 10.10.2007 | [2008/16] | Priority number, date | DE20062015631U | 10.10.2006 Original published format: DE 202006015631 U | DE20061058591 | 11.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006058591 | [2008/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1911363 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1911363 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A43B3/12, A43B7/16, A43B13/08, A43B13/12, A43B13/14, A43B13/18 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
A43B13/183 (EP);
A43B13/08 (EP);
A43B13/10 (EP);
A43B13/12 (EP);
A43B13/148 (EP);
A43B3/128 (EP);
A43B7/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/51] |
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 16.10.2008 | BA | 16.10.2008 | HR | 16.10.2008 | MK | 16.10.2008 | RS | 16.10.2008 | Title | German: | Schuhsohle bzw. Schuhwerk mit Schuhsohle | [2008/16] | English: | Footwear and sole for footwear | [2008/16] | French: | Chaussure et semelle de chaussure | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 17.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.10.2007 | CY | 20.12.2017 | CZ | 20.12.2017 | DK | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | ES | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | IT | 20.12.2017 | LT | 20.12.2017 | LV | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | MT | 20.12.2017 | NL | 20.12.2017 | PL | 20.12.2017 | PT | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | SE | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | BG | 20.03.2018 | GR | 21.03.2018 | IS | 20.04.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/27] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5875567 (BAYLEY RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-9,16 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 60; figures 1,2a,2b,3 *; | [A]DE20305000U (WANG GUOHUA [CN]) [A] 1-9,16 * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 17; figure 1 *; | [X]US6925732 (CLARKE RICHARD DOUGLAS [US]) [X] 1-9,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006010715 (TSENG YU-LIN [TW], et al) [A] 1,16* the whole document *; | [A]US2006130362 (JUAN EDWARD [TW]) [A] 1,3,4,6-9,16 * the whole document * | by applicant | CH77239 | DE712886 | AT393937B | US5875567 | US6925732 |