EP1881620 - Method and apparatus for controlling transmission of packets in a wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Core Wireless Licensing S.à.r.l. 16, avenue Pasteur 2310 Luxembourg / LU | [2013/51] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Core Wireless Licensing S.à.r.l. 16, avenue Pasteur 2310 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states 2011 Intellectual Property Asset Trust Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company National Association 919 North Market Street, Suite 1600 Wilmington DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Östman, Kjell Kreivinkuja 2 24800, Halikko / FI | 02 /
Malkamäki, Esa Riippakoivunkuja 17 B 02130, Espoo / FI | [2013/51] |
Former [2008/04] | 01 /
Östman, Kjell Kreivinkuja 2 24800, Halikko / FI | ||
02 /
Malkamäki, Esa Riippakoivunkuja 17 B 02130, Espoo / FI | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2013/42] |
Former [2008/04] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07118315.6 | 16.08.2002 | [2008/04] | Priority number, date | US20010935212 | 22.08.2001 Original published format: US 935212 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1881620 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1881620 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/18, H04W72/04 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
H04W28/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/04] | H04B7/216, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2008/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Paketübertragung in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem | [2008/04] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling transmission of packets in a wireless communication system | [2008/04] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la commande de la transmission de paquets dans un système de communication sans fil | [2008/04] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 27.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02755518.4 / EP1506628 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020755518) is 02.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.12.2013 | BG | 18.12.2013 | CY | 18.12.2013 | CZ | 18.12.2013 | DK | 18.12.2013 | EE | 18.12.2013 | MC | 18.12.2013 | SK | 18.12.2013 | TR | 18.12.2013 | GR | 19.03.2014 | PT | 18.04.2014 | LU | 16.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 16.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 16.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 16.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 18.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0877512 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-6* page 8, column 14, line 29 - line 49 * |