EP1876561 - Method and system for distributing data to mobile devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CVON Innovations Limited 22 Ganton Street London W1F 7BY / GB | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Myllynen, Harri CVON Innovations Ltd 22 Ganton Street London, Greater London W1F 7BY / GB | 02 /
Leino, Pasi CVON Innovations Ltd 22 Ganton Street London, Greater London W1F 7BY / GB | 03 /
Ohrling, Antti CVON Innovations Ltd 22 Ganton Street London, Greater London W1F 7BY / GB | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | McCann, Heather Alison, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | McCann, Heather Alison, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07118601.9 | 13.09.2004 | [2008/02] | Priority number, date | GB20030021337 | 11.09.2003 Original published format: GB 0321337 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1876561 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1876561 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1876561 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, H04M3/487, H04W88/02, // H04M1/66 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
A63F13/00 (GB);
H04L67/53 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0277 (EP,US);
G09G5/39 (GB);
G09G5/42 (GB);
H04L65/1101 (GB);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (GB);
H04M1/72403 (GB);
H04M1/72406 (GB);
H04M1/72427 (EP,GB,US);
H04M1/725 (GB);
H04M3/487 (GB);
H04M3/4878 (EP,GB,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/18] | G06Q30/00, H04M3/487, H04Q7/32, // H04M1/66 | ||
Former IPC [2008/02] | G06Q30/00, H04M3/487, H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Verteilen von Daten an mobile Einrichtungen | [2008/02] | English: | Method and system for distributing data to mobile devices | [2008/02] | French: | Procédé et système permettant de distribuer des données aux dispositifs mobiles | [2008/02] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04768437.8 / EP1668880 | Divisional application(s) | EP08159331.1 / EP1970853 | EP08159333.7 / EP1970854 | EP10153358.6 / EP2184711 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.12.2009 | BE | 16.12.2009 | CY | 16.12.2009 | CZ | 16.12.2009 | DK | 16.12.2009 | EE | 16.12.2009 | FI | 16.12.2009 | PL | 16.12.2009 | RO | 16.12.2009 | SE | 16.12.2009 | SI | 16.12.2009 | SK | 16.12.2009 | TR | 16.12.2009 | BG | 16.03.2010 | GR | 17.03.2010 | PT | 16.04.2010 | HU | 17.06.2010 | LU | 13.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
LU | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8910610 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [XY]EP0831629 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [KR]); | [Y]EP1043905 (PHONE COM INC [US]); | [X]US2002004743 (KUTARAGI KEN [JP], et al); | [A]EP1195701 (GESTWEB SPA [IT]); | [A]WO0250632 (SWANBERG ARTHUR [US], et al); | [A]WO03019913 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]KR20030049440 (LG TELECOM LTD [KR]); | [XAY]US2003144022 (HATCH RICHARD [GB]) | by applicant | WO0131497 | WO0250632 | US2003144022 | WO2004AU01296 |