EP2058662 - Diagnosis of diseases by measuring cell mediated extracellular matrix degradation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Golla-Franz, Anke Lucia Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Golla-Franz, Anke Lucia Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07118656.3 | 17.10.2007 | [2009/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2058662 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/546, G01N33/543, G01N33/68, G01N33/569, G01N33/574 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
G01N33/6887 (EP);
G01N33/54306 (EP);
G01N33/54313 (EP);
G01N33/56966 (EP);
G01N33/574 (EP);
G01N2800/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Diagnose von Erkrankungen durch Messung des zellenvermittelten Abbaus der extrazellulären Matrix | [2009/20] | English: | Diagnosis of diseases by measuring cell mediated extracellular matrix degradation | [2009/20] | French: | Diagnostic de maladies en mesurant la dégradation de matrice extracellulaire au moyen d'une cellule | [2009/20] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2009/49] | 26.07.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0220825 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * page 22, line 12 - page 25, line 4; claims 5,7 * * page 27, line 22 - page 29, line 27 * * page 38, line 6 - page 39, line 12 * * page 53, lines 6--29 * [A] ; | [X]EP1195432 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] *; | [A]WO02057786 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [X]WO03058193 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [X] 2,4,6-9 * page 11, line 33 * * page 12, lines 2,31 * * page 14, lines 5,6 * * page 17, paragraph L - page 17, paragraph 2; claims 1,4,19 *; | [X] - MCKEOWN M ET AL, "ROLE OF THE CELLULAR ATTACHMENT DOMAIN OF FIBRONECTIN IN THE PHAGOCYTOSIS OF BEADS BY HUMAN GINGIVAL FIBROBLASTS IN-VITRO", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1990), Database accession no. PREV199191048138, XP002470129 [X] 2,4-8 * abstract * | [A] - COOPMAN P J ET AL, "INTEGRIN ALPHA3BETA1 PARTICIPATES IN THE PHAGOCYTOSIS OF EXTRACELLULAR MATRIX MOLECULES BY HUMAN BREAST CANCER CELLS", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF THE CELL, (1996), vol. 7, no. 11, pages 1789 - 1804, XP000991380 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - MUELLER S C ET AL, "CELLULAR INVASION INTO MATRIX BEADS LOCALIZATION OF BETA-1 INTEGRINS AND FIBRONECTIN TO THE INVADOPODIA", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 99, no. 2, pages 213 - 226, XP002470128 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [ ] - CELL AND TISSUE RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 262, no. 3, ISSN 0302-766X, pages 523 - 530 |