EP2053628 - Capped lamp/reflector unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Pet, Robert Jacob Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Pet, Robert Jacob Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07119376.7 | 26.10.2007 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2053628 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J5/54, H01J5/62 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
H01J5/54 (EP,US);
H01J5/62 (EP,US);
H01J61/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gesockelte Lampe/Reflektoreinheit | [2009/18] | English: | Capped lamp/reflector unit | [2009/18] | French: | Unité de lampe à culot et réflecteur | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2009/40] | 22.05.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2252476 (WRIGHT DANIEL K) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US2005169014 (KOEGLER JOHN M III [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]WO2006019951 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-10 |