EP1917871 - A machine manufacturing filters for tobacco products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D S.p.A. Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | [2016/15] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states G.D. S.p.A Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Esposti, Marco Via Michelangelo, 3 40033, Casalecchio di Reno (Bologna) / IT | 02 /
Balletti, Leonardo Via Seminario, 64 40068, San Lazzaro di Savena (Bologna) / IT | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Bianciardi, Ezio, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2014/08] |
Former [2008/19] | Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria Bugnion S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 07119422.9 | 26.10.2007 | [2008/19] | Priority number, date | IT2006BO00751 | 31.10.2006 Original published format: IT BO20060751 | [2008/19] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1917871 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1917871 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1917871 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/02 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
A24D3/0233 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Maschine zur Filterherstellung für Tabakprodukte | [2008/19] | English: | A machine manufacturing filters for tobacco products | [2008/19] | French: | Machine de fabrication de filtres pour produits du tabac | [2009/22] |
Former [2008/19] | Machine de fabrication de filtres pour produits de tabac | Examination procedure | 18.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 22.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.2010
ADMISSIBLE Hauni Maschinenbau AG Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8 - 32 21033 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ Speiser, et al, et al Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.2010
ADMISSIBLE Hauni Maschinenbau AG Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8 - 32 21033 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, et al, et al Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | 03.05.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.11.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.06.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.07.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.07.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.03.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.06.2009 | BE | 17.06.2009 | CY | 17.06.2009 | CZ | 17.06.2009 | DK | 17.06.2009 | EE | 17.06.2009 | FI | 17.06.2009 | IT | 17.06.2009 | LT | 17.06.2009 | LV | 17.06.2009 | MT | 17.06.2009 | NL | 17.06.2009 | PL | 17.06.2009 | RO | 17.06.2009 | SI | 17.06.2009 | SK | 17.06.2009 | TR | 17.06.2009 | BG | 17.09.2009 | SE | 17.09.2009 | GR | 18.09.2009 | ES | 28.09.2009 | IS | 17.10.2009 | PT | 17.10.2009 | IE | 26.10.2009 | LU | 26.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | HU | 18.12.2009 | GB | 26.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | [2013/34] |
Former [2013/33] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
CY | 17.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
MT | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
TR | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
IE | 26.10.2009 | ||
LU | 26.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
HU | 18.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
MT | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
IE | 26.10.2009 | ||
LU | 26.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
HU | 18.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
MT | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
IE | 26.10.2009 | ||
LU | 26.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
IE | 26.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1101253 (REEMTSMA H F & PH) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3485144 (WILLIS NORMAN EDWIN, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 48; figure - *; | [A]US3645175 (RAKOWICZ JAN ANTONI) [A] 1 * column 1, line 41 - line 75; figure 2 *; | [A]US4535789 (IRVING CHRISTOPHER L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 29 - line 45; figure - *; | [A]EP0594054 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [PA]EP1741353 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [PA] 1* paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021]; figure - * | Opposition | WO2005058079 | - Brochure "AF 2E/KDF 2E Filterstab-Produktionslinie" |