EP1918878 - Hierarchical tile-based rasterization algorithm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivante Corporation 255 Santa Ana Court Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2008/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cai, Mike 6261 Potrero Drive Newark, CA 94560 / US | 02 /
Garritsen, Frido 3922 Picea Court Hayward, CA 94542 / US | 03 /
Chen, Ming 2812 Westberry Drive San Jose, CA 95132 / US | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2018/50] |
Former [2008/19] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07119695.0 | 31.10.2007 | [2008/19] | Priority number, date | US20060592799 | 03.11.2006 Original published format: US 592799 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1918878 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1918878 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1918878 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/40 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
G06T11/40 (EP,US);
G06T15/00 (KR);
G06T15/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/50] |
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hierarchischer kachelbasierter Rasterisierungsalgorithmus | [2008/19] | English: | Hierarchical tile-based rasterization algorithm | [2008/19] | French: | Algorithme de tramage hiérarchique à base de pavés | [2008/19] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 22.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18202346.5 / EP3467780 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2007 | AT | 12.12.2018 | CY | 12.12.2018 | CZ | 12.12.2018 | DK | 12.12.2018 | EE | 12.12.2018 | ES | 12.12.2018 | FI | 12.12.2018 | IT | 12.12.2018 | LT | 12.12.2018 | LV | 12.12.2018 | MC | 12.12.2018 | MT | 12.12.2018 | NL | 12.12.2018 | PL | 12.12.2018 | RO | 12.12.2018 | SE | 12.12.2018 | SI | 12.12.2018 | SK | 12.12.2018 | TR | 12.12.2018 | BG | 12.03.2019 | GR | 13.03.2019 | IS | 12.04.2019 | PT | 12.04.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 31.10.2007 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 12.12.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7061495 (LEATHER MARK M [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 41 - line 44 * * column 5, line 17 - line 23 * * column 5, line 58 - line 59 * * column 6, line 44 - line 46 * * column 8, line 12 - line 26 * * column 9, line 25 - line 52 *; | [X] - GREENE N, "HIERARCHICAL POLYGON TILING WITH COVERAGE MASKS", PROCEEDINGS OF COMPUTER GRAPHICS 1996 (SIGGRAPH). NEW ORLEANS, NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (19960804), pages 65 - 74, XP000682722 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 67 * | Examination | WO9410647 | US7224364 | - MCCOOL M. D. ET AL, "Incremental and hierarchical Hilbert order edge equation polygon rasterizatione", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM SIGGRAPH/EUROGRAPHICS WORKSHOP ON GRAPHICS HARDWARE , HWWS '01, New York, New York, USA, (20010101), doi:10.1145/383507.383528, pages 65 - 72, XP055026752 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/383507.383528 | - MCCORMACK J ET AL, "TILED POLYGON TRAVERSAL USING HALF-PLANE EDGE FUNCTIONS", PROCEEDINGS 2000 SIGGRAPH/EUROGRAPHICS WORKSHOP ON GRAPHICS HARDWARE. INTERLAKEN, SWITZERLAND, AUG. 21 - 22, 2000; [SIGGRAPH / EUROGRAPHICS WORKSHOP ON GRAPHICS HARDWARE], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (20000821), doi:10.1145/346876.346882, ISBN 978-1-58113-257-1, pages 15 - 21, XP000964470 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/346876.346882 | by applicant | US7061495 | - GREEN N, "HIERARCHICAL POLYGON TILING WITH COVERAGE MASKS", PROCEEDINGS OF COMPUTER GRAPHICS 1996 (SIGGRAPH). NEW ORLEANS, (19960804), pages 65 - 74 | - MCCOOL M.D. ET AL., "Incremental and hierarchical Hilbert order edge equation polygon rasterization", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM SIGGRAPH/EUROGRPAPHICS WORKSHOP ON GRAPHICS HARDWARE, HWWS '01, (20010101), doi:doi:10.1145/383507.383528, pages 65 - 72, XP055300255 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/383507.383528 |