EP2055738 - Impact-modified polypropylene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis Technology Oy P.O. Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernreitner, Klaus Zaubertalstrasse 1 4010 Linz / AT | 02 /
Reussner, Jens Höhenweg 24 Kammerschlag 4201 Eidenberg / AT | 03 /
Pham, Tung Goglerfeldgasse 9 4040 Linz / AT | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Lux, Berthold Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Lux, Berthold Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 D-80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07119709.9 | 31.10.2007 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055738 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/08, C08L23/10, C08L23/12, C08L23/14, // C08L9/00 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L23/0807 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08L23/142 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0807, C08L2666/08 (US,EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/08 (EP,US);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/08 (EP,US);
C08L23/142, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/142, C08L2666/08 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schlagzähmodifiziertes Polypropylen | [2009/19] | English: | Impact-modified polypropylene | [2009/19] | French: | Polypropylène modifié par impact | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2007 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4948840 (BERTA DOMINIC A [US]) [X] 1,25,30* abstract *; | [X]WO2004087803 (PIRELLI & C SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-32 * abstract * * page 9, line 32 - page 10 * * page 8 *; | [X]US2005032981 (YU THOMAS CHEN-CHI [US], et al) [X] 1,25,30 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 25 * * page 4, paragraph 36 *; | [X]US2005113521 (PELLICONI ANTEO [IT], et al) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1655332 (ADVANCED ELASTOMER SYSTEMS [US]) [X] 1-32 * abstract * * page 3 * * page 4 - page 5 * | by applicant | WO2004087803 | EP1655332 |