EP1890428 - Methods and systems for capture, replay and real-time seeking in remote presentation protocols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citrix Systems, Inc. 851 W. Cypress Creek Road Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryman, Paul, c/o Citrix Systems, Australasia R&D Pty Ltd. Level 3, 1 Julius Avenue North Ryde, 2113 / AU | 02 /
Croft, Richard, c/o Citric Systems, Australasia R&D Pty Ltd. Level 3, 1 Julius Avenue North Ryde, 2113 / AU | 03 /
Low, Tony, c/o Citrix Systems, Australasia R&D Pty Ltd. Level 3, 1 Julius Avenue North Ryde, 2113 / AU | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07119879.0 | 11.01.2006 | [2008/08] | Priority number, date | US20050035851 | 14.01.2005 Original published format: US 35851 | US20050036486 | 14.01.2005 Original published format: US 36486 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1890428 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
H04L67/08 (EP);
H04L69/329 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Systeme zur Aufzeichnung, Wiedergabe und Echtzeitsuche in Fernpräsentationsprotokollen | [2008/08] | English: | Methods and systems for capture, replay and real-time seeking in remote presentation protocols | [2008/08] | French: | Procédés et systèmes de capture, reproduction et recherche en temps réel dans les protocoles de présentation à distance | [2008/08] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06718013.3 / EP1836805 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SANDKLEF H, "Testing Applications with Xnee", LINUX JOURNAL, vol. 2004, no. 117, ISSN 1075-3583, (2004), pages 1 - 6, ACM DIGITAL LIBRARY, URL: http://portal.acm.org/citation.cfm?id=959336.959341&coll=GUIDE&dl=ACM&idx=J508&part=periodical&WantType=periodical&title=Linux%20Journal, (20060517), XP002381423 [X] 1-23 * the whole document * | [X] - STANONIK R, "Recording/Playing Both Gaze Date and Computer Interaction", WEB PAGE, (20001130), URL: http://hci.ucsd.edu/eye/gaze.txt, (20060517), XP002381424 [X] 1-23 * the whole document * | [X] - SANDKLEF H, "Xnee Manual", MANUAL VERSION 1.08D, (20031003), pages 1 - 36, INTERNET ARCHIVE, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20040627125613/www.gnu.org/software/xnee/www/manual/xnee.pdf, (20060515), XP002381190 [X] 1-23 * page 4 - page 6 * |