EP1921506 - Position Detecting Method and Device, Patterning Device, and Subject to be detected [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkita-cho Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg., Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkita-cho Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg., Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkita-cho Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-8285 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Masao c/o Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. Tenjinkita-cho 1-1, Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori, Kamigyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Kilian Kilian & Partner Aidenbachstraße 54 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | Wilhelms . Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07119916.0 | 02.11.2007 | [2008/20] | Priority number, date | JP20060304298 | 09.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006304298 | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1921506 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1921506 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03F9/00 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
G03F7/70391 (EP,US);
H01L22/00 (KR);
G03F9/7046 (EP,US);
G03F9/7076 (EP,US);
G03F9/7088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Positionsermittlung, Mustererzeugungsvorrichtung und zu ermittelnder Gegenstand | [2008/20] | English: | Position Detecting Method and Device, Patterning Device, and Subject to be detected | [2008/20] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection de position, dispositif de formation de motifs et sujet à détecter | [2008/20] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 21.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 07.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003235330 (TANAKA HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-16 * the whole document * [Y] 4,10; | [XY]US2004169833 (TANAKA HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-16 * pages 3,5; figures 6A-6B * [Y] 4,10; | [YA]WO2005070684 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 4,10 * page 5 * * page 12, lines 20-26 *[A] 3,9; | [X]US2006072087 (KLINKHAMER JACOB FREDERIK F [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,11-16 * pages 1,3, paragraph 85; figures 3-8 * |