EP1921299 - Fuel injection control apparatus of internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamura, Yoshiya, c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Yoshiyasu, c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07120272.5 | 08.11.2007 | [2008/20] | Priority number, date | JP20060304288 | 09.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006304288 | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1921299 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/34 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
F02D41/009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Kraftstoffeinspritzung für einen Verbrennungsmotor | [2008/20] | English: | Fuel injection control apparatus of internal combustion engine | [2008/20] | French: | Appareil de commande d'injection de carburant pour moteur à combustion interne | [2008/20] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 27.11.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |