EP1923871 - Method of configuring control information of a recording medium, recording and reproducing method using the same, and apparatus thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/21] | Recording medium, method of configuring control information thereof, recording and reproducing method using the same, and apparatus thereof | ||
[2008/26] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suh, Sang Woon 9-1003, Mujigae Apt., Seocho 2(i)-dong, Seocho-gu 137-771, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kim, Jin Yong 504-803, Tapmaeul Jindeok Apt. Yatap-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07120278.2 | 13.08.2004 | [2008/21] | Priority number, date | KR20030056540 | 14.08.2003 Original published format: KR 20030056540 | KR20030061785 | 04.09.2003 Original published format: KR 20030061785 | KR20030063591 | 15.09.2003 Original published format: KR 20030063591 | KR20030065628 | 22.09.2003 Original published format: KR 20030065628 | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1923871 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1923871 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/007, G11B19/12, G11B7/24 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
G11B7/00456 (EP,US);
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B7/0079 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Title | German: | Konfigurationsverfahren für Steuerinformation für ein Aufzeichnungsmedium, Aufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabeverfahren hierfür, sowie Gerät dafür | [2008/26] | English: | Method of configuring control information of a recording medium, recording and reproducing method using the same, and apparatus thereof | [2008/26] | French: | Procédé de configuration des informations de commande pour un support d'enregistrement, méthode d'enregistrement et de reproduction des mêmes, et appareil pour ceux-ci | [2008/26] |
Former [2008/21] | Aufzeichnungsmedium, Konfigurationsverfahren für diesbezügliche Steuerinformation, Aufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabeverfahren sowie Gerät dafür | ||
Former [2008/21] | Recording medium, method of configuring control information thereof, recording and reproducing method using the same, and apparatus thereof | ||
Former [2008/21] | Support d'enregistrement, procédé de configuration des informations de commande associées, procédé d'enregistrement et de reproduction utilisant un tel support et appareil pour ceux-ci | Examination procedure | 05.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 30.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 12.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04748539.6 / EP1656668 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040748539) is 04.05.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1331631 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,13,30 * paragraphs [0050] - [0081]; figures 1-3 *[A] 2-12,14-29,31-43 | Examination | WO2005006324 | by applicant | EP1331631 |