EP2058131 - Droplet selection mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast- Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boot, ronaldus Jacobus Johannes Wilhelminalaan 12 5691 AZ Son en Breugel / NL | 02 /
Houben, René Jos Hoge Notte 49 6031 HW Nederweert / NL | 03 /
Oosterhuis, Gerrit Salderes 19 5682 EN Best / NL | 04 /
Aulbers, Antonius Paulus Boerhaavelaan 16 5644 BD Eindhoven / NL | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07120334.3 | 09.11.2007 | [2009/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2058131 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/09, B41J2/03 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
B41J2/09 (EP,US);
B41J2002/031 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/03] |
Former [2009/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tröpfchenauswahlmechanismus | [2009/20] | English: | Droplet selection mechanism | [2009/20] | French: | Mécanisme de sélection de gouttelette | [2009/20] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/23] | 23.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1521874 (ITT CREED) [Y] 1-4,7,9-11,15,16 * page 1, line 55 - page 2, line 73 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2041831 (MARCONI CO LTD) [A] 5-7,10,12,13 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1598779 (ITT CREED) [A] 1-3,9,10,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US4341310 (SANGIOVANNI JOSEPH J, et al) [X] 1-3,9,10,12,17 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 58 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4914522 (DUFFIELD PETER L [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,7,9-11,15,16 * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 38 *; | [A]EP1228874 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-5,9-12,15,16 * paragraphs [0019] - [0028] *; | [DA]WO2006101386 (SCHAPPELIJK ONDERZOEK TNO NL O [NL], et al) [DA] 1,7-9,14* page 21, line 17 - page 27, line 8 * |