EP1933059 - Vibration absorber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/25] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thiele, Christoph Weichselweg 7 85241 Hebertshausen / DE | [2008/25] | Application number, filing date | 07120537.1 | 13.11.2007 | [2008/25] | Priority number, date | DE20061059297 | 15.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006059297 | [2008/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1933059 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1933059 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1933059 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/46 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
F16F9/463 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/39] |
Former [2008/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schwingungsdämpfer | [2008/25] | English: | Vibration absorber | [2008/25] | French: | Amortisseur d'oscillations | [2008/25] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 31.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1699678 (SCHELLENGER NEWTON C) [Y] 6 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 59 - line 63 *; | [Y]GB2074798 (LITTON SYSTEMS INC) [Y] 5* the whole document *; | [Y]GB2123112 (ATSUGI MOTOR PARTS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,7,8,6,5 * figure 2 * * page 1, line 109 - line 117 * * page 3, line 36 - line 38 *; | [Y]US5538439 (FELL MICHAEL [CA], et al) [Y] 1-4,7,8 * figures 1,3 * * column 1, line 63, paragraph 67 * | by applicant | DE4238734 |