EP1926163 - A negative active material, a method of preparing the same, and a rechargeable lithium battery including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 673-7, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 673-7, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-Dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city Kyungki-do 442-390 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yew, Kyoung-Han Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 575 Shin-dong Yeong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Choi, Nam-Soon Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Sung-Soo Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 575 Shin-dong Yeong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Su-Yeong Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/31] |
Former [2008/22] | 01 /
Yew, Kyoung-Han Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 575 Shin-don Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Choi, Nam-Soon Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 575 Shin-don Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Sung-Soo Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 575 Shin-don Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Park, Su-Yeong Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 575 Shin-don Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Killin, Stephen James, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Killin, Stephen James, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07121149.4 | 20.11.2007 | [2008/22] | Priority number, date | KR20060115866 | 22.11.2006 Original published format: KR 20060115866 | [2008/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1926163 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1926163 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/62, H01M4/38, H01M10/0525, H01M4/48 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
H01M4/62 (EP,US);
H01M4/36 (KR);
C01G31/006 (EP,US);
C01G37/006 (EP,US);
C01G39/006 (EP,US);
C01G41/006 (EP,US);
H01M10/02 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/134 (EP,US);
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
H01M4/60 (KR);
C01P2002/82 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/22] | H01M4/62, H01M4/38, H01M10/40, H01M4/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/06] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Negativ-Aktivmaterial, Herstellungsverfahren dafür und wiederaufladbare Lithiumbatterie damit | [2008/22] | English: | A negative active material, a method of preparing the same, and a rechargeable lithium battery including the same | [2008/22] | French: | Matériel actif négatif, son procédé de préparation, et batterie au lithium rechargeable l'incorporant | [2008/22] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 20.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1511101 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 8,19,25 * paragraphs [0019] , [0048] ** examples 1-23 *; | [Y]US2006088766 (KIM SUNG-SOO [KR], et al) [Y] 8,19,25 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0012] , [0047] , [0048] , [0058] - [0062] *; | [XY] - OSKAM G ET AL, "SOL-GEL SYNTHESIS OF CARBON/SILICA GEL ELECTRODES FOR LITHIUM INTERCALATION", ELECTROCHEMICAL AND SOLID-STATE LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199912), vol. 2, no. 12, ISSN 1099-0062, pages 610 - 612, XP001101158 [X] 1-4,6,7,9,11,20,21,23,24,26 * the whole document * [Y] 5,8,10,12-19,22,25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1390923 | [XY] - NG S B ET AL, "SI-O NETWORK ENCAPSULATED GRAPHITE-SILICON MIXTURES AS NEGATIVE ELECTRODES FOR LITHIUM-ION BATTERIES", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010215), vol. 94, no. 1, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 63 - 67, XP001164263 [X] 1,3,6,7,9,20,23,24,26 * the whole document * [Y] 5,10,12-18,22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(00)00603-0 | [X] - AURBACH D ET AL, "BEHAVIOR OF LITHIATED GRAPHITE ELECTRODES COMPRISING SILICA BASED BINDER", JOURNAL OF APPLIED ELECTROCHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, DORDRECHT, NL, (199810), vol. 28, no. 10, ISSN 0021-891X, pages 1051 - 1059, XP000786929 [X] 1,3,6,7,9,20,23,24,26 * page 1051 - page 1052 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1003412917632 | [A] - CHEN ET AL, "Improving the performance of soft carbon for lithium-ion batteries", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (20060520), vol. 51, no. 19, ISSN 0013-4686, pages 3890 - 3894, XP005427738 [A] 1,3,6,7,10,13,17,18,20,23,24,26 * page 3890 - page 3891 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2005.11.004 | by applicant | US2006088766 | - OSKAM, G ET AL., ELECTROCHEMICAL AND SOLID-STATE LETTERS, (1999), vol. 2, no. 12, pages 610 - 612 | - S.B ET AL., JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (2001), vol. 94, pages 63 - 67 | - AURBACH, D. ET AL., JOURNAL OF APPLIED ELECTROCHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 28, pages 1051 - 1059 |