EP1890464 - System and method of accessing keys for secure messaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Michael, K. 1938 Mapleridge Drive Peterborough Ontario K9K 2E4 / CA | 02 /
BROWN, Michael, S. 350 University Downs Cres. Waterloo Ontario N2K 4B1 / CA | 03 /
LITTLE, Herbert, A. 504 Old Oak Place Waterloo Ontario N2T 2V8 / CA | 04 /
ADAMS, Neil, P. 550 Little Dover Cres. Waterloo Ontario N2K 4E4 / CA | [2012/01] |
Former [2008/08] | 01 /
BROWN, Michael, K. 1938 Mapleridge Drive Peterborough Ontario K9K 2E4 / CA | ||
02 /
BROWN, Michael, S. 350 University Downs Cres. Waterloo Ontario N2K 4B1 / CA | |||
03 /
LITTLE, Herbert, A. 504 Old Oak Place Waterloo Ontario N2T 2V8 / CA | |||
04 /
ADAMS, Neil, P. 550 Little Dover Cres. Waterloo Ontario N2K 4E4 / CA | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/17] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Schmit Chretien Schihin & Mahler Baaderstraße 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07121215.3 | 02.04.2004 | [2008/08] | Priority number, date | US20030494369P | 12.08.2003 Original published format: US 494369 P | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1890464 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1890464 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1890464 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3821 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/0442 (EP,US);
H04L63/061 (EP,US);
H04L63/126 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04W12/02 (US);
H04W12/033 (EP,US);
H04W12/04 (EP,US);
H04W12/10 (EP,US);
H04L63/18 (EP,US);
H04L63/20 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | 20.08.2008 | HR | 20.08.2008 | LT | 20.08.2008 | LV | 20.08.2008 | MK | 20.08.2008 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Zugreifen auf Schlüssel zur sicheren Nachrichtenübermittlung | [2011/04] | English: | System and method of accessing keys for secure messaging | [2008/08] | French: | Système et procédé pour l'accès aux clés pour la messagerie sécurisée | [2011/04] |
Former [2008/08] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Zugreifen auf Schlüssel für die sichere Nachrichtenübermittlung | ||
Former [2008/08] | Émissions de rétroéclairage à affichage contrôlé spectralement pour compatibilité avec le système d'imagerie de vision nocturne | Miscellaneous | EPB 2008/41: This application was filed on 21-11-2007 as a divisional application to the application mentioned under INID code 62. | Examination procedure | 20.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 25.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04725257.2 / EP1661356 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040725257) is 13.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2004 | AT | 04.01.2012 | BE | 04.01.2012 | CY | 04.01.2012 | CZ | 04.01.2012 | DK | 04.01.2012 | EE | 04.01.2012 | FI | 04.01.2012 | IT | 04.01.2012 | NL | 04.01.2012 | PL | 04.01.2012 | RO | 04.01.2012 | SE | 04.01.2012 | SI | 04.01.2012 | SK | 04.01.2012 | TR | 04.01.2012 | IE | 02.04.2012 | LU | 02.04.2012 | BG | 04.04.2012 | GR | 05.04.2012 | ES | 15.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | PT | 04.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 02.04.2012 | ||
LU | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 04.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - "PGP Freeware for Windows 95, Windows 98, Windows NT, Windows 2000 & Windows Millennium User's Guide, Version 7.0", INTERNET, (200101), pages 1 - 246, URL: http://www.surfkit.nl/instructions/email/PGPWinUsersGuide.pdf, (20040624), XP002286313 [Y] 1-24 * page 47 - page 50 * * page 53 - page 80; table 4.1 * * page 96 - page 99 * * page 101 - page 103 * | [Y] - BROWN M ET AL, "PGP in Constrained Wireless Devices", PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX SECURITY SYMPOSIUM, XX, XX, (20000814), pages 247 - 261, XP002210575 [Y] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * | [A] - "WinPT Documentation", INTERNET, (20030415), URL: http://heanet.dl.sourceforge.net/sourceforge/winpt/winpt-handbook-0.2rc2.pdf, (20040629), XP002286314 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | [A] - MICHAEL FISCHER V. MOLLARD, "Gnu Privacy Guard (GnuPG) Mini Howto", INTERNET, (20011130), URL: http://www.gnupg.org/(en)/documentation/index.html, (20040629), XP002286315 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | [A] - ASHLEY M ET AL., "The GNU Privacy Handbook", INTERNET, (1999), URL: http://www.gnupg.org/(en)/documentation/index.html, (20040629), XP002286316 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | [A] - SCRIBNER D. ET AL, "GNUPG FREQUENTLY ASKED QUESTIONS", INTERNET, (20030630), URL: http://www.gnupg.org/(en)/documentation/index.html, (20040629), XP002286317 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | [A] - CRISPO B ET AL, "WWW security and trusted third party services", FUTURE GENERATIONS COMPUTER SYSTEMS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (200002), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 0167-739X, pages 331 - 341, XP004185845 [A] 14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-739X(99)00057-6 | [A] - KLOBUCAR T ET AL, "Certificate policies formalisation and comparison", COMPUTER STANDARDS AND INTERFACES, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA. LAUSANNE, CH, (19990801), vol. 21, no. 3, ISSN 0920-5489, pages 299 - 307, XP004183122 [A] 14,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0920-5489(99)00011-2 | by applicant | - PGP FREEWARE FOR WINDOWS 95, WINDOWS 98, WINDOWS NT, WINDOWS 2000 & WINDOWS MILLENNIUM USER'S GUIDE, VERSION 7.0, (200101), pages 1 - 246 |