EP1926243 - Communication terminal apparatus, communication system, communication method and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Koichi c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Inte Osaka Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Ichimasa, Takashi c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Inte Osaka Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07121434.0 | 23.11.2007 | [2008/22] | Priority number, date | JP20060317683 | 24.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006317683 | [2008/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1926243 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
H04L1/1845 (EP,US);
H04L1/0053 (EP,US);
H04L1/20 (EP,US);
H04L1/1607 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kommunikationsendgerät, Kommunikationssystem, Kommunikationsverfahren und Programm | [2008/22] | English: | Communication terminal apparatus, communication system, communication method and program | [2008/22] | French: | Appareil de terminal de communication, système de communication, procédé de communication et programme | [2008/22] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |