EP1927527 - Steering apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Masaaki c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Ch Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
Hirose, Masahiko c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Ch Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 03 /
Ohara, Yoshihide c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Ch Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Takahiro c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Ch Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07121652.7 | 27.11.2007 | [2008/23] | Priority number, date | JP20060320480 | 28.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006320480 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1927527 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1927527 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927527 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62D3/12 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
B62D3/12 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18976 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1967 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2010/36] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lenkvorrichtung | [2008/23] | English: | Steering apparatus | [2008/23] | French: | Appareil de direction | [2008/23] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 01.07.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0368159 (TRW INC [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column 5, lines 39-53; figures 2,5-7 *; | [Y]US6408976 (SAITO TATSUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * figures 1-3,2a *; | [A]US2006043690 (PANKAU MATTHEW [AU]) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0038] , [0039]; figures 1,3-5,7,8 * | by applicant | JP2001151140 |