EP1928185 - Backlight unit and display apparatus including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Son, Jung-young Hanil Villa 104-301, 121 Gumi-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Saveljef, Vladmir V Daeju Parkvill Apt., 106-507, Yangbeol-ri, Opo-eup Gwangju-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Choi, Yong-jin DooSan Hillsvill Apt., 101-506, Gongneung 2-dong, Nonwon-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Eom, Hyo-soon Jinju-Apt. 1-115, 20-4 Sincheon-dong, Songpa-gu Seoul / KR | 05 /
Kwack, Kae-dal Geondeok Villa 6-201, 154-2 Gugi-dong, Jongno-gu Seoul / KR | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07121693.1 | 27.11.2007 | [2008/23] | Priority number, date | KR20060119173 | 29.11.2006 Original published format: KR 20060119173 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1928185 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1928185 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
H04N13/361 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
H04N13/302 (EP,US);
H04N13/359 (EP,US);
G02B5/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2010/01] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rückbeleuchtungseinheit und Anzeigevorrichtung damit | [2008/23] | English: | Backlight unit and display apparatus including the same | [2008/23] | French: | Unité de rétroéclairage et appareil d'affichage doté de celle-ci | [2008/23] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 30.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0156265 (4D VISION GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0139] , [0140] , [0161] , [0356]; figure 37 *; | [DA]US2002008674 (SON JUNG YOUNG [KR], et al) [DA] 1-15* paragraphs [0028] , [0032]; figure 3a *; | [A]EP1538850 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0057] , [0061]; figure 10 * | by applicant | KR20010098308 | EP1538850 |