EP1913914 - Absorbent core for an absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2014/32] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busam, Ludwig Talstrasse 17 65510, Huenstetten / DE | 02 /
Ehrnsperger, Bruno Johannes Taunusstr. 10 C 65812, Bad Soden / DE | 03 /
Divo, Michael Feldbergstrasse 14 61381, Friedrichsdorf / DE | 04 /
Becker, Uwe Juergen Kirchheimer Strasse 78 53881, Euskirchen / DE | 05 /
Engel, Roland Kelkheimer Strasse 8 65843, Sulzbach / DE | 06 /
Lindner, Torsten Berliner Platz 4 61476, Kronberg / DE | 07 /
Link, Siegfried In der Hoell 4 53937, Schleiden/Oberhausen / DE | 08 /
Maier, Volker In den Essigbenden 61 53879, Euskirchen / DE | 09 /
Siddiquee, Sanaul Kabir 40 Champ du Roi 1040, Etterbeek / BE | 10 /
Stiehl, Gabriele Neustr. 3 65824, Schwalbach / DE | 11 /
Tombuelt-Meyer, Thomas Auf dem Hielig 16 53947, Nettersheim / DE | [2008/19] |
Former [2008/17] | 01 /
Busam, Ludwig Talstrasse 17 65510, Huenstetten / DE | ||
02 /
Ehrnsperger, Bruno Johannes Bonner Strasse 5 65812, Bad Soden / DE | |||
03 /
Divo, Michael Feldbergstrasse 14 61381, Friedrichsdorf / DE | |||
04 /
Becker, Uwe Juergen Josef-Gebertz-Strasse 4 53881, Euskirchen / DE | |||
05 /
Engel, Roland Kelkheimer Strasse 8 65843, Sulzbach / DE | |||
06 /
Lindner, Torsten Im Wiesental 7 61476, Kronberg / DE | |||
07 /
Link, Siegfried In der Hoell 4 53937, Schleiden/Oberhausen / DE | |||
08 /
Maier, Volker In den Essigbenden 61 53879, Euskirchen / DE | |||
09 /
Siddiquee, Sanaul 40 Champ du Roi 1040, Etterbeek / BE | |||
10 /
Stiehl, Gabriele Neustr. 3 65824, Schwalbach / DE | |||
11 /
Tombuelt-Meyer, Thomas Auf dem Hielig 16 53947, Nettersheim / DE | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2013/15] | Anderson, James Edward George Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2011/36] | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2010/28] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07122176.6 | 12.02.2003 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1913914 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1913914 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1913914 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1913914 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/539, A61F13/53, A61F13/536, A61F13/15 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
A61F13/15658 (EP,US);
A61F13/49 (KR);
A61F13/5323 (US);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A61F13/15699 (EP,US);
A61F13/53 (KR);
A61F13/534 (KR);
A61F13/536 (EP,US);
A61F13/539 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530547 (EP,US);
A61F2013/5395 (EP,US);
B32B2310/024 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/17] | A61F13/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Title | German: | Saugfähiger Kern für einen saugfähigen Artikel | [2008/17] | English: | Absorbent core for an absorbent article | [2008/17] | French: | Partie centrale absorbante pour un article absorbant | [2008/17] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03002678.5 / EP1447067 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-City Ehime / JP Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-City Ehime / JP Opponent's representative Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | 19.05.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.11.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.11.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.11.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.11.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.06.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.2010 | BE | 14.07.2010 | CY | 14.07.2010 | CZ | 14.07.2010 | DK | 14.07.2010 | EE | 14.07.2010 | FI | 14.07.2010 | HU | 14.07.2010 | SE | 14.07.2010 | SI | 14.07.2010 | SK | 14.07.2010 | BG | 14.10.2010 | GR | 15.10.2010 | PT | 15.11.2010 | IE | 12.02.2011 | LU | 12.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2011/29] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4381783 (ELIAS ROBERT T) [AD] 1-22* column W *; | [X]US5425725 (TANZER RICHARD W [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * column 19, line 53 - column 22, line 29; figure - * * column 13, line 28 - column 14, line 37 * * column 28, line 66 - column 29, line 6 *; | [X]US2002102392 (FISH JEFFREY E [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13,15-22 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0069]; figure - *; | [X]US2002115969 (MAEDA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11,13-22 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0120]; figure - * | by applicant | US3860003 | US4381783 | US4610678 | US4834735 | US4888231 | US5037416 | US5151092 | US5260345 | US5269775 | US5387207 | US5397316 | WO9516746 | WO9517868 | EP0724418 | US5554145 | US5569234 | US5571096 | US5625222 | US6004306 | EP0752892 | WO02064877 | EP1403419 | Opposition | US4055180 | US4381783 | US4670011 | JPH06269475 | US5425725 | JP2000238161 | EP1088537 | US2002102392 | US2002115969 |