EP1936228 - System for control by cable of an automatic parking brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caruso, Corrado Via Gorizia 29 70121, BARI / IT | 02 /
Tristano, Nicola Via Nazionale 93/P 75100, MATERA / IT | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Bosch Systèmes de Freinage Service Brevets 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor 126 Rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 07122452.1 | 06.12.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | FR20060011169 | 20.12.2006 Original published format: FR 0611169 | [2008/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1936228 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/34 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
B60T13/746 (EP);
B60T11/046 (EP);
F16D65/28 (EP);
F16D2121/26 (EP);
F16D2125/582 (EP);
F16D2125/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | Steuersystem über Kabel einer Bremse für das automatische Einparken | [2008/26] | English: | System for control by cable of an automatic parking brake | [2008/26] | French: | Système de commande à câbles d'un frein de stationnement automatique | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 12.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 29.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102004010420 (KUESTER AUTOMOTIVE CONTROL SYS [DE]) [X] 1-7,15-17 * paragraph [0008]; figures 6,7 *; | [X]EP0754610 (PEUGEOT [FR]; CITROEN SA [FR]) [X] 1-6,10-17 * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 12; figures 4a-4c *; | [X]EP1607297 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-9,15-17 * figures 4c,5b,5d *; | [A]WO03008248 (PBR AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]; WANG NUI [AU]) [A] 1-17 * figures 1,4 * |