EP1930863 - Detecting and recognizing traffic signs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mobileye Technologies Limited Greg Tower 7 Florinis Street 1034 Nicosia / CY | [2009/16] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states MobilEye Technologies, Ltd. Greg Tower, 7 Florinis St. 1034 Nicosia / CY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stein, Gideon, P. 18 Shakar St. 96263, Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
Worlfovitz, Uri Naomi Street 1 Haifa / IL | 03 /
Shachar, Ori El Salvador 7/3 Jerusalem / IL | 04 /
Taieb, Yoav Arazim 23 Beit Hakerem Jerusalem / IL | [2008/30] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
Stein, Gideon, P. 18 Shakar St. 96263, Jerusalem / IL | ||
02 /
Worlfovitz, Uri Naomi Street 1 Haifa / IL | |||
03 /
Shachar, Ori El Salvador 7/3 Jerusalem / IL | |||
04 /
Taieb, Yoav Arazin 23 Beit Hakerim Jerusalem / IL | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07122458.8 | 06.12.2007 | [2008/24] | Priority number, date | US20060868783P | 06.12.2006 Original published format: US 868783 P | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1930863 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1930863 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1930863 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0967, // G06K9/00 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
G08G1/0967 (EP,US);
G06V20/582 (EP,US);
G08G1/096783 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Title | German: | Detektion und Erkennung von Verkehrszeichen | [2008/24] | English: | Detecting and recognizing traffic signs | [2008/24] | French: | Détection et reconnaissance des signes de la route | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 29.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11175972.6 / EP2383713 | EP11175975.9 / EP2383679 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2011 | BE | 03.08.2011 | CY | 03.08.2011 | CZ | 03.08.2011 | DK | 03.08.2011 | EE | 03.08.2011 | FI | 03.08.2011 | HU | 03.08.2011 | IT | 03.08.2011 | LT | 03.08.2011 | LV | 03.08.2011 | MT | 03.08.2011 | NL | 03.08.2011 | PL | 03.08.2011 | RO | 03.08.2011 | SE | 03.08.2011 | SI | 03.08.2011 | SK | 03.08.2011 | TR | 03.08.2011 | BG | 03.11.2011 | GR | 04.11.2011 | ES | 14.11.2011 | IS | 03.12.2011 | PT | 05.12.2011 | IE | 06.12.2011 | LU | 06.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
TR | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
LU | 06.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
LU | 06.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
LU | 06.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 03.08.2011 | |
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 03.08.2011 | |
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006034484 (BAHLMANN CLAUS [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-7 * * page 1, paragraph 11 * * page 2, paragraphs 20-24 *; | [A] - ARTURO DE LA ESCALERA ET AL, "Road Traffic Sign Detection and Classification", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (19971201), vol. 44, no. 6, ISSN 0278-0046, XP011023317 [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - "The Road Sign Recognition System - RS2", INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://euler.fd.cvut.cz/research/rs2/rs2algorithm.html, (20000411), XP002135353 [A] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | US2006034484 |