EP1912298 - ZnO based compound semiconductor light emitting device and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | For all designated states Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states National Institute Of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | ||
For all designated states Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | |||
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | ||
For all designated states Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niki, Shigeru 19-6, Higashi 2-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Fons, Paul 38-7, Takezono 3-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki / JP | 03 /
Iwata, Kakuya 713-401, Azuma 2-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki / JP | 04 /
Tanabe, Tetsuhiro c/o ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | 05 /
Takasu, Hidemi c/o ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | 06 /
Nakahara, Ken c/o ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [2008/31] |
Former [2008/16] | 01 /
Niki, Shigeru 19-6, Higashi 2-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki / JP | ||
02 /
Fons, Paul 38-7, Takezono 3-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki / JP | |||
03 /
Iwata, Kakuya 708-412, Azuma 2-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki / JP | |||
04 /
Tanabe, Tetsuhiro c/o ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | |||
05 /
Takasu, Hidemi c/o ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | |||
06 /
Nakahara, Ken c/o ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07123034.6 | 26.07.2000 | [2008/16] | Priority number, date | JP19990211222 | 26.07.1999 Original published format: JP 21122299 | JP19990211223 | 26.07.1999 Original published format: JP 21122399 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1912298 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/327 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
H01L33/28 (EP,US);
H01S5/327 (EP,US);
H01L33/0087 (EP,US);
H01S5/021 (EP,US);
H01S5/32308 (EP,US);
H01S5/32341 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/16] | Title | German: | Lichtemittierende Halbleitervorrichtung auf der Basis von ZnO und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2008/16] | English: | ZnO based compound semiconductor light emitting device and method for manufacturing the same | [2008/16] | French: | Dispositif électroluminescent de semi-conducteur à composant basé sur ZnO et son procédé de fabrication | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00949916.1 / EP1199755 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07283436 ; | [A]JPH10256673 ; | [A]JPS55110089 ; | [A]EP0863555 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07283436 A 19951027 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10256673 A 19980925 (KAGAKU GIJUTSU SHINKO JIGYODAN) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801112), vol. 0041, no. 62, Database accession no. (E - 033), & JP55110089 A 19800825 (FUTABA CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * the whole document * | [A] - TANG Z K ET AL, "ROOM-TEMPERATURE ULTRAVIOLET LASER EMISSION FROM SELF-ASSEMBLED ZNOMICROCYSTALLITE THIN FILMS", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19980622), vol. 72, no. 25, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 3270 - 3272, XP000771126 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.121620 | by applicant | - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19980622), vol. 72, no. 25, pages 3270 - 3272 |