EP2014365 - Air curtain-isolated biosafety cabinet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institute of Occupational Safety and Health, Council of Labor Affairs Executive Yuan No. 99, Lane 407, Hengke Rd. 221 Shijr City, Taipei / TW | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hung, Rong-Fung Fl. 12, No. 8-11, Lane 2 Section 4, Hsing-Long Rd. Taipei / TW | 02 /
Shih, Tung-Sheng, @c/o Institute of Occupational Safety and Health Council of Labor Affairs Executive Yuan No. 99, Lane 407, Hengke Rd. Shijr City 221 / TW | 03 /
Chang, Cheng-Ping, @c/o Institute of Occupational Safety and Health Council of Labor Affairs Executive Yuan No. 99, Lane 407, Hengke Rd. Shijr City 221 / TW | 04 /
Chen, Chun-Wan, @c/o Institute of Occupational Safety and Health Council of Labor Affairs Executive Yuan No. 99, Lane 407, Hengke Rd. Shijr City 221 / TW | 05 /
Hung, Chen-Hsiung No.43, Sec. 4, Keelung Rd. Da-an District Taipei 106 / TW | [2013/16] |
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
Hung, Rong-Fung Fl. 12, No. 8-11, Lane 2, Section 4, Hsing-Long Rd. Taipei / TW | ||
02 /
Shih, Tung-Sheng, c/o Institute of Occupational Safety and Health Council of Labor Affairs Executive, Yuan No. 99, Lane 407, Hengke Rd. Shijr City 221 / TW | |||
03 /
Chang, Cheng-Ping, c/o Institute of Occupational Safety and Health Council of Labor Affairs Executive, Yuan No. 99, Lane 407, Hengke Rd. Shijr City 221 / TW | |||
04 /
Chen, Chun-Wan, c/o Institute of Occupational Safety and Health Council of Labor Affairs Executive, Yuan No. 99, Lane 407, Hengke Rd. Shijr City 221 / TW | |||
05 /
Hung, Chen-Hsiung No.43, Sec. 4, Keelung Rd., Da-an District Taipei 106 / TW | Representative(s) | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Denninger Str. 169 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstrasse 14 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/03] | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstrasse 14 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07123726.7 | 19.12.2007 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | TW20070209015U | 01.06.2007 Original published format: TW 96209015 U | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2014365 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2014365 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014365 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01L1/00, B08B15/02, F24F3/16 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
B01L1/50 (EP);
B08B15/023 (EP);
F24F3/163 (EP);
F24F9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2010/08] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Luftvorhangisolierter Biosicherheitsschrank | [2009/03] | English: | Air curtain-isolated biosafety cabinet | [2009/03] | French: | Armoire de biosécurité isolée par rideau d'air | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 14.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | [2014/14] |
Former [2014/11] | IT | 17.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0139128 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * figure 3 *; | [Y]DE3811780 (PRETTL ROLF [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * column 5; figure 4 *; | [Y]EP1745866 (INST OF OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH COUNCIL OF LABOR AFFAIRS [TW]) [Y] 1-6 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US4637301 (SHIELDS WILLIAM [US]) [Y] 1-6 * column 4, line 6 - line 26; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US4098174 (LANDY JEROME J) [Y] 1-6 * column 4, line 34 - line 36; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2006079164 (DECASTRO EUGENE A [US], et al) [Y] 2 * figures 1,2; claim 4 *; | [Y]US3886851 (BERNER ERLING) [Y] 2 * figures 2,6,7,15 * |